Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Brano Arsenovic (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-07-12 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Michael Wiesinger (from 2009-11-10) (until 2010-11-06) | 1972-12-27 | ||||
Horst Koppel (until 2009-11-09) | 1948-05-17 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Henning Burger (from 2010-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1969-12-16 | ||||
Michael Wiesinger (until 2009-11-09) | 1972-12-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Michael Lutz (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-01-25 | |||
21 | Marco Sejna (until 2010-06-30) | 1972-03-20 | |||
27 | Christopher Sommerer (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-03-05 | |||
28 | Christian Kruger (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-04-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Tim Pollmann (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-01-05 | |||
3 | Steven Ruprecht (until 2011-01-28) | 1987-06-24 | |||
4 | David Pisot (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-07-06 | |||
5 | Soren Dressler (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-12-26 | |||
13 | Michael Wenczel (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-11-23 | |||
15 | Tobias Fink (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-12-11 | |||
18 | Moise Bambara (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-11-10 | |||
19 | Malte Metzelder (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-05-19 | |||
20 | Ralf Keidel (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-03-06 | |||
33 | Ian Joy (from 2009-09-22) (until 2009-12-31) | 1981-07-14 | |||
35 | Mathias Wittek (from 2010-01-27) (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-03-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Stefan Leitl (until 2013-06-30) | 1977-08-29 | |||
8 | Markus Karl (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-02-14 | |||
10 | Fabian Gerber (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-11-28 | |||
11 | Andreas Neuendorf (until 2010-06-30) | 1975-02-09 | |||
14 | Emin Ismaili (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-05-31 | |||
16 | Andreas Buchner (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-05-15 | |||
17 | Robert Flessers (until 2010-12-31) | 1987-02-11 | |||
26 | Alexander Buch (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-05-12 | |||
44 | Patrick Molzl (from 2010-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-12-28 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Ersin Demir (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-12-08 | |||
9 | Moritz Hartmann (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-06-20 | |||
22 | Stefan Muller (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-02-24 | |||
23 | Steffen Wohlfarth (until 2011-01-06) | 1983-09-14 | |||
24 | Steffen Schneider (until 2009-12-31) | 1988-06-09 | |||
30 | Robert Braber (until 2010-06-30) | 1982-11-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2010-05-14 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2010-05-17 20:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |