Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Thomas Kohler (until 2014-06-30) | 1967-06-17 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Peter Pacult (from 2012-12-18) (until 2013-08-18) | 1959-10-28 | ||||
Steffen Menze (from 2012-12-09) (until 2012-12-17) | 1969-01-28 | ||||
Ralf Loose (until 2012-12-08) | 1963-01-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Nico Dabritz (until 2014-06-30) | 1971-08-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Markus Scholz (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-05-17 | |||
13 | Benjamin Kirsten (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-06-02 | |||
35 | Florian Fromlowitz (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-07-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Vujadin Savic (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-07-01 | |||
4 | Cheikh Gueye (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-12-30 | |||
5 | Romain Bregerie (until 2014-07-04) | 1986-08-09 | |||
6 | Florian Jungwirth (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-01-27 | |||
20 | Cuneyt Koz (until 2013-01-29) | 1992-10-12 | |||
21 | Muhamed Subasic (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-03-19 | |||
22 | Bjarne Thoelke (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-04-11 | |||
33 | Jens Mockel (until 2012-08-07) | 1988-02-21 | |||
37 | Toni Leistner (until 2013-01-27) | 1990-08-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Idir Ouali (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-05-21 | |||
8 | Filip Trojan (until 2014-06-30) | 1983-02-21 | |||
11 | Anthony Losilla (until 2014-07-16) | 1986-03-10 | |||
17 | Lars Jungnickel (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-08-31 | |||
18 | Tobias Kempe (from 2013-01-21) (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-06-27 | |||
19 | Giannis Papadopoulos (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-03-09 | |||
23 | Denis Streker (from 2013-01-30) (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-04-06 | |||
24 | David Solga (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-10-16 | |||
25 | Robert Koch (until 2014-07-20) | 1986-02-26 | |||
27 | Sebastian Schuppan (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-07-18 | |||
28 | Marcel Franke (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-04-05 | |||
29 | Tobias Janicke (from 2012-08-30) (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-03-16 | |||
38 | Tobias Muller (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-05-31 | |||
40 | Cristian Fiel (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-03-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Pavel Fort (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-06-26 | |||
10 | Mickael Pote (until 2014-07-05) | 1984-09-24 | |||
14 | Hasan Pepic (until 2013-01-30) | 1993-03-16 | |||
30 | Dmitri Chlebosolow (from 2013-01-25) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-10-07 | |||
31 | Petar Sliskovic (from 2012-08-21) (until 2013-01-28) | 1991-02-21 | |||
39 | Lynel Kitambala (from 2012-08-27) (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-10-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2013-05-24 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2013-05-28 20:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |