Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Sven Beuckert (until 2020-07-05) | 1973-12-12 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ilija Gruev (from 2015-11-03) (until 2018-10-01) | 1969-10-30 | ||||
Gino Lettieri (until 2015-11-02) | 1966-12-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Michael Ratajczak (until 2016-06-30) | 1982-04-16 | |||
22 | Maurice Schumacher (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-03-14 | |||
30 | Marcel Lenz (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-05-03 | |||
39 | Timothy Dieng (from 2016-02-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-11-23 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Lascha Dwali (from 2015-08-31) (until 2015-12-31) | 1995-05-14 | ||||
2 | Matthias Kuhne (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-09-27 | |||
3 | Enis Hajri (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-03-06 | |||
4 | Dustin Bomheuer (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-04-17 | |||
5 | Branimir Bajic (until 2018-06-30) | 1979-10-19 | |||
21 | Rolf Feltscher (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-10-06 | |||
25 | Thomas Meissner (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-03-26 | |||
27 | Dan-Patrick Poggenberg (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-03-28 | |||
35 | Gianluca Hossmann (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-03-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Martin Dausch (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-03-04 | |||
7 | Sascha Dum (until 2015-08-23) | 1986-07-03 | |||
9 | Pierre De Wit (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-09-26 | |||
13 | Zlatko Janjic (until 2018-02-06) | 1986-05-07 | |||
14 | Tim Albutat (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-09-23 | |||
15 | Erik Wille (until 2015-10-20) | 1993-03-28 | |||
17 | Kevin Wolze (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-03-09 | |||
19 | Nico Klotz (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-09-20 | |||
20 | Dennis Grote (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-08-09 | |||
23 | James Holland (from 2015-07-25) (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-05-15 | |||
24 | Dominik Behr (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-01-26 | |||
28 | Steffen Bohl (until 2016-06-30) | 1983-12-28 | |||
38 | Baris Ozbek (from 2016-02-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-09-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Yusupha Yaffa (from 2015-09-23) (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-12-31 | ||||
7 | Tomane (from 2016-01-27) (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-10-23 | |||
8 | Thomas Broker (until 2018-01-11) | 1985-01-22 | |||
10 | Kingsley Onuegbu (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-03-05 | |||
11 | Stanislav Iljutcenko (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-08-13 | |||
15 | Victor Obinna (from 2015-09-09) (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-03-25 | |||
16 | Andreas Wiegel (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-07-21 | |||
18 | Simon Brandstetter (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-05-02 | |||
26 | Ahmet Engin (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-08-09 | |||
33 | Kevin Scheidhauer (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-02-13 | |||
36 | Giorgi Tschanturia (from 2015-09-23) (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-04-11 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Fabian Schnellhardt (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-01-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2016-05-20 19:10 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2016-05-24 19:10 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |