Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Alois Schwartz (from 2017-08-29) (until 2020-02-03) | 1967-03-28 | ||||
Marc-Patrick Meister (until 2017-08-20) | 1980-07-23 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Zlatan Bajramovic (from 2017-08-20) (until 2017-08-29) | 1979-08-12 | ||||
Christian Eichner (from 2017-08-20) (until 2017-08-29) | 1982-11-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dirk Orlishausen (until 2018-06-30) | 1982-08-15 | |||
28 | Sebastian Gessl (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-06-30 | |||
32 | Benjamin Uphoff (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-08-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Giuseppe Leo (from 2017-09-02) (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-01-30 | ||||
- | Ylli Sallahi (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-04-06 | |||
3 | Daniel Gordon (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-01-16 | |||
4 | Martin Stoll (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-02-09 | |||
5 | David Pisot (until 2021-06-30) | 1987-07-06 | |||
17 | Severin Buchta (until 2018-01-29) | 1997-02-14 | |||
21 | Marco Thiede (from 2017-09-25) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-05-20 | |||
25 | Jonas Fohrenbach (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-01-26 | |||
27 | Marlon Dinger (until 2020-09-30) | 2001-06-16 | |||
35 | Matthias Bader (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-06-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Burak Camoglu (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-10-05 | |||
6 | Andreas Hofmann (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-04-13 | |||
7 | Marc Lorenz (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-07-18 | |||
8 | Marcel Mehlem (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-03-01 | |||
10 | Marvin Wanitzek (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-05-07 | |||
11 | Boubacar Barry (until 2017-08-15) | 1996-04-15 | |||
13 | Kai Bulow (until 2018-07-20) | 1986-05-31 | |||
14 | Alexander Siebeck (until 2018-01-30) | 1993-11-03 | |||
23 | Florent Muslija (until 2018-08-31) | 1998-07-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Oguzhan Aydogan (from 2017-08-21) (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-02-04 | ||||
9 | Marvin Pourie (from 2018-01-27) (until 2020-01-21) | 1991-01-08 | |||
9 | Oskar Zawada (until 2018-01-02) | 1996-02-01 | |||
19 | Malik Karaahmet (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-01-18 | |||
20 | Valentino Vujinovic (until 2019-01-14) | 1999-02-20 | |||
22 | Nathaniel Amamoo (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-08-23 | |||
24 | Fabian Schleusener (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-10-24 | |||
27 | Dominik Stroh-Engel (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-11-27 | |||
29 | Kai Luibrand (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-04-24 | |||
30 | Anton Fink (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-07-31 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Severin Buchta (from 2018-01-29) (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-02-14 | ||||
Alexander Siebeck (from 2018-01-30) (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-11-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2018-05-18 18:15 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2018-05-22 18:15 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |