Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Schlappner (from 1996-03-12) (until 1997-10-09) | 1940-05-22 | ||||
Roland Dickgiesser (from 1995-12-05) (until 1996-03-11) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Hans-Gunter Neues (from 1995-09-20) (until 1995-12-04) | 1950-11-14 | ||||
Uli Stielike (until 1995-09-19) | 1954-11-15 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Walter Pradt (until 1996-06-30) | 1949-04-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Marco Langner (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-05-08 | ||||
Andreas Clauss (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-01-13 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dennis Mackert (until 1998-12-31) | 1977-04-03 | ||||
Jens Gerlach (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-07-03 | ||||
Enrico Barth (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-10-06 | ||||
Frank Scheuber (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-10-21 | ||||
Andreas Wagenhaus (until 1996-12-31) | 1964-10-29 | ||||
Michael Kopper (until 1996-10-31) | 1966-11-17 | ||||
Zanko Zwetanow (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-01-06 | ||||
Thomas Faulstich (until 1996-06-30) | 1976-03-31 | ||||
Zamir Shpuza (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-06-26 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andrzej Kobylanski (from 1995-10-22) (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-07-31 | ||||
Mirko Reichel (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-12-02 | ||||
Norbert Hofmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-01-01 | ||||
Jurgen Luginger (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-12-08 | ||||
Fabrizio Hayer (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-05-11 | ||||
Matthias Dehoust (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-12-14 | ||||
Michael Zeyer (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-06-09 | ||||
Norbert Nachtweih (until 1996-06-30) | 1957-06-04 | ||||
Manfred Schnalke (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-03-09 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Thomas Epp (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-04-07 | ||||
Uwe Hartenberger (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-02-01 | ||||
Bjarki Gunnlaugsson (from 1996-01-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-03-06 | ||||
Georgios Karagiannis (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-09-16 | ||||
Dieter Eckstein (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-03-12 | ||||
Timur Eroglu (until 1996-06-30) | 1977-03-22 | ||||
Mariusz Andai (until 1996-06-30) | 1978-06-05 | ||||
Jonathan Akpoborie (until 1995-12-31) | 1968-10-20 | ||||
Danny Winkler (until 1995-12-17) | 1973-08-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1995-08-05 15:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1995-08-09 20:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1995-08-12 15:30 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1995-08-18 20:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1995-08-30 19:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1995-09-03 15:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1995-09-09 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1995-09-16 15:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 1995-09-25 20:15 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1995-09-30 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1995-10-13 19:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1995-10-21 15:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1995-10-27 19:30 |
3 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1995-11-10 20:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1995-11-19 15:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1995-11-26 18:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1995-11-29 20:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1995-12-03 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1995-12-10 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1996-03-08 19:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1996-03-16 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1996-03-22 19:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1996-03-30 15:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 1996-04-08 15:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1996-04-14 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1996-04-19 19:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1996-04-26 19:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1996-05-03 19:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1996-05-12 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1996-05-15 19:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1996-05-19 15:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1996-05-24 19:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1996-06-02 15:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1996-06-08 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |