Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Enver Maric (until 1998-06-30) | 1948-04-23 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Enver Maric (from 1998-05-11) (until 1998-06-30) | 1948-04-23 | ||||
Uli Maslo (from 1997-09-18) (until 1998-05-10) | 1938-07-06 | ||||
Rudolf Wojtowicz (until 1997-09-16) | 1956-06-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
22 | Frank Juric (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-10-28 | |||
42 | Thorsten Walther (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-09-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Rudolf Zedi (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-08-31 | ||||
Adiele Echendu (until 1998-06-30) | 1978-11-17 | ||||
Holger Fach (from 1998-01-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1962-09-06 | ||||
2 | Marc Beckers (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-10-19 | |||
3 | Pawel Bocian (until 1999-08-31) | 1973-04-09 | |||
4 | Kristian Zedi (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-08-31 | |||
6 | Darko Drazic (until 1998-06-30) | 1963-01-17 | |||
9 | Christian Beeck (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-12-18 | |||
19 | Mathias Jack (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-02-15 | |||
27 | Jorg Bach (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-11-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mike Rietpietsch (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-03-26 | ||||
Gleb Panferow (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-05-29 | ||||
Rodrigo Vieira (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-09-08 | ||||
8 | Lars Unger (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-09-30 | |||
10 | Igor Dobrowolski (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-08-27 | |||
14 | Harald Katemann (until 1999-06-29) | 1972-07-07 | |||
18 | Guido Jorres (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-03-07 | |||
18 | Thorsten Judt (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-06-30 | |||
25 | Robert Niestroj (until 1998-11-12) | 1974-12-02 | |||
28 | Rudi Istenic (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-01-10 | |||
36 | Dennis Ibrahim (until 1997-11-19) | 1974-12-24 | |||
41 | Mario Tolkmitt (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-10-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ganiyu Shittu (until 2000-12-31) | 1979-12-22 | ||||
Tibor Jancula (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-06-16 | ||||
Robert Kocis (until 1997-12-31) | 1973-12-27 | ||||
11 | Marek Lesniak (until 1999-06-30) | 1964-02-29 | |||
11 | Stefan Trienekens (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-08-21 | |||
17 | Igli Tare (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-07-25 | |||
29 | Mac Younga-Mouhani (until 1997-12-31) | 1974-08-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1997-07-25 19:15 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1997-08-01 19:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1997-08-08 19:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1997-08-24 15:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1997-08-31 15:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 1997-09-15 19:15 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1997-09-21 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1997-09-26 19:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1997-10-04 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1997-10-19 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1997-10-26 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1997-11-02 14:30 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1997-11-09 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1997-11-23 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1997-11-30 15:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1997-12-05 19:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1997-12-12 19:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 1998-02-16 19:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1998-02-25 19:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1998-03-01 15:00 |
4 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 1998-03-09 19:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1998-03-15 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1998-03-20 19:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1998-03-29 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1998-04-03 19:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1998-04-12 15:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1998-04-19 15:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1998-04-24 19:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1998-05-03 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1998-05-10 15:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1998-05-15 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1998-05-22 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1998-06-03 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1998-06-07 15:00 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |