Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Pierre Littbarski (from 2001-06-25) (until 2002-11-03) | 1960-04-16 | ||||
Joachim Hopp (from 2000-11-10) (until 2001-05-31) | 1966-07-10 | ||||
Seppo Eichkorn (from 2000-10-16) (until 2001-05-31) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Wolfgang Frank (until 2000-10-15) | 1951-02-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Gintaras Stauce (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-12-24 | |||
25 | Tomasz Bobel (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-12-29 | |||
26 | Carsten Kramer (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-07-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Torsten Wohlert (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-12-10 | |||
5 | Mirko Stark (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-09-28 | |||
7 | Marijan Kovacevic (until 2001-10-18) | 1973-08-31 | |||
11 | Pavel Drsek (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-09-22 | |||
12 | Marco Gruszka (until 2001-11-30) | 1975-12-06 | |||
15 | Horst Steffen (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-03-03 | |||
27 | Peter Schyrba (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-10-17 | |||
31 | Hans Sarpei (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-06-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Thomas Hoersen (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-01-11 | |||
3 | Hendrik Liebers (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-12-18 | |||
6 | Darlington Omodiagbe (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-07-02 | |||
14 | Marcus Wedau (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-12-31 | |||
17 | Ilija Gruev (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-10-30 | |||
19 | Jorg Neun (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | |||
20 | Michael Zeyer (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-06-09 | |||
21 | Thomas Vana (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-10-09 | |||
23 | Ralf Keidel (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-03-06 | |||
24 | Carsten Wolters (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-07-25 | |||
28 | Rainer Torres (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-01-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Peter Kozle (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-11-18 | |||
9 | Soren Seidel (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-10-10 | |||
10 | Jean-Kasongo Banza (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-06-26 | |||
13 | Marius Ebbers (from 2000-12-11) (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-01-04 | |||
18 | Goran Milovanovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-03-31 | |||
19 | Gustav Policella (from 2000-10-11) (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-09-14 | |||
29 | Sercan Guvenisik (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-03-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2000-08-14 20:15 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2000-08-20 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2000-09-05 19:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2000-09-11 20:15 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2000-09-15 19:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2000-09-22 19:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2000-09-29 19:00 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2000-10-13 19:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2000-10-22 15:00 |
4 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2000-10-29 15:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2000-11-04 15:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2000-11-10 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2000-11-19 15:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2000-11-24 19:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2000-12-01 19:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2000-12-08 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2000-12-12 19:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2000-12-15 19:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2001-01-28 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2001-02-12 20:15 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2001-02-18 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2001-02-23 19:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2001-02-28 19:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2001-03-04 15:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2001-03-09 19:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2001-03-18 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2001-04-01 15:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2001-04-06 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2001-04-12 19:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2001-04-23 20:15 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2001-04-30 20:15 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2001-05-04 19:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2001-05-13 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2001-05-20 15:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |