Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Holger Bahra (until 2014-06-30) | 1958-03-20 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Neuhaus (until 2014-06-30) | 1959-11-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Andre Hofschneider (until 2014-06-30) | 1970-06-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jan Glinker (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-01-18 | |||
13 | Christoph Haker (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-02-06 | |||
28 | Kilian Pruschke (from 2010-12-05) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-09-08 | |||
40 | Marcel Hottecke (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-04-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Ahmed Madouni (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-10-04 | |||
5 | Christian Stuff (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-08-11 | |||
6 | Bernd Rauw (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-01-08 | |||
7 | Patrick Kohlmann (until 2014-06-30) | 1983-02-25 | |||
14 | Paul Thomik (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-01-25 | |||
15 | Daniel Gohlert (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-09-25 | |||
16 | Christoph Menz (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-12-22 | |||
18 | Maurice Trapp (until 2013-01-13) | 1991-12-31 | |||
26 | Stefan Gill (from 2011-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-01-01 | |||
27 | Bone Uaferro (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-01-04 | |||
29 | Michael Parensen (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-06-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Christopher Quiring (until 2017-01-13) | 1990-11-23 | |||
3 | Dominic Peitz (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-09-11 | |||
8 | Mac Younga-Mouhani (until 2011-06-30) | 1974-08-01 | |||
10 | Santi Kolk (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-10-02 | |||
12 | Oliver Hofmann (from 2011-03-12) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-08-19 | |||
17 | Torsten Mattuschka (until 2014-08-30) | 1980-10-04 | |||
20 | Jerome Polenz (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-11-07 | |||
23 | Bjorn Brunnemann (until 2011-08-11) | 1980-08-06 | |||
25 | Philip Malinowski (from 2010-12-05) (until 2010-12-06) | 1991-10-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | John Mosquera (until 2012-03-01) | 1988-01-15 | |||
11 | Kenan Sahin (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-10-27 | |||
19 | Chinedu Ede (until 2012-07-22) | 1987-02-05 | |||
21 | Halil Savran (until 2012-01-05) | 1985-06-20 | |||
22 | Karim Benyamina (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-12-18 | |||
24 | Steven Skrzybski (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-11-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2010-08-20 18:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2010-08-28 13:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2010-09-10 18:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2010-09-17 18:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2010-09-22 17:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2010-09-26 13:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2010-10-03 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2010-10-15 18:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2010-10-22 18:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2010-10-29 18:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2010-11-07 13:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2010-11-13 13:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2010-11-19 18:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2010-11-28 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2010-12-06 20:15 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2010-12-13 20:15 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2010-12-20 20:15 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2011-01-14 18:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-01-23 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-01-30 13:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2011-02-05 13:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2011-02-11 18:00 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2011-02-19 13:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2011-02-25 18:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-03-06 13:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2011-03-12 13:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-03-20 13:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-04-03 13:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-04-10 13:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2011-04-15 18:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-04-24 13:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2011-04-29 18:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-05-08 13:30 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-05-15 13:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |