Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Mathias Hain (until 2020-06-30) | 1972-12-31 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Andre Schubert (until 2012-09-26) | 1971-07-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Thomas Meggle (until 2012-09-27) | 1975-02-22 | ||||
Jan-Moritz Lichte (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-01-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Benedikt Pliquett (until 2013-09-01) | 1984-12-20 | |||
13 | Philipp Tschauner (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-11-03 | |||
26 | Philipp Heerwagen (from 2012-01-14) (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-04-13 | |||
33 | Ole Springer (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-11-29 | |||
34 | Arvid Schenk (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-07-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Moritz Volz (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-01-21 | |||
3 | Lasse Sobiech (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-01-18 | |||
4 | Fabio Morena (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-03-19 | |||
5 | Carlos Zambrano (until 2012-08-16) | 1989-07-10 | |||
11 | Ralph Gunesch (until 2012-01-30) | 1983-09-02 | |||
16 | Markus Thorandt (until 2015-06-30) | 1981-04-01 | |||
20 | Sebastian Schachten (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-11-06 | |||
24 | Carsten Rothenbach (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-09-03 | |||
27 | Jan-Philipp Kalla (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-08-06 | |||
32 | Davidson Drobo-Ampem (until 2011-08-30) | 1988-03-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Patrick Funk (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-02-11 | |||
8 | Florian Bruns (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-08-21 | |||
10 | Charles Takyi (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-11-12 | |||
17 | Fabian Boll (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-06-16 | |||
18 | Max Kruse (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-03-19 | |||
22 | Fin Bartels (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-02-07 | |||
25 | Kevin Schindler (from 2011-08-17) (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-05-21 | |||
25 | Petar Filipovic (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-09-14 | |||
30 | Dennis Daube (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-07-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Rouwen Hennings (until 2012-01-12) | 1987-08-28 | |||
9 | Marius Ebbers (until 2013-06-30) | 1978-01-04 | |||
14 | Petar Sliskovic (from 2011-08-31) (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-02-21 | |||
19 | Mahir Saglik (until 2013-01-06) | 1983-01-18 | |||
23 | Deniz Naki (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-07-09 | |||
31 | Deniz Herber (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-03-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2011-07-16 13:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2011-07-25 20:15 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2011-08-05 18:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2011-08-12 20:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2011-08-22 20:15 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-08-28 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-09-11 13:30 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2011-09-19 20:15 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2011-09-23 18:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2011-10-01 13:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2011-10-17 20:15 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-10-23 13:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2011-10-28 18:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2011-11-05 13:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2011-11-19 13:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-11-27 13:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2011-12-02 18:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2011-12-11 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2011-12-19 20:15 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2012-02-04 13:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2012-02-12 13:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2012-02-17 18:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2012-02-26 13:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2012-03-05 20:15 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2012-03-12 20:15 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2012-03-18 13:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2012-03-25 13:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2012-04-02 20:15 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2012-04-07 13:00 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2012-04-10 17:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2012-04-13 18:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2012-04-22 13:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2012-04-29 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2012-05-06 13:30 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |