Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Mathias Hain (until 2020-06-30) | 1972-12-31 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Roland Vrabec (from 2013-11-07) (until 2014-09-03) | 1974-03-06 | ||||
Michael Frontzeck (until 2013-11-06) | 1964-03-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Timo Schultz (until 2014-06-30) | 1977-08-26 | ||||
Roland Vrabec (until 2013-11-06) | 1974-03-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Philipp Heerwagen (from 2013-09-09) (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-04-13 | |||
1 | Benedikt Pliquett (until 2013-09-01) | 1984-12-20 | |||
13 | Philipp Tschauner (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-11-03 | |||
30 | Robin Himmelmann (until 2021-01-12) | 1989-02-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
8 | Bernd Nehrig (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-09-28 | |||
14 | Philipp Ziereis (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-03-14 | |||
16 | Markus Thorandt (until 2015-06-30) | 1981-04-01 | |||
20 | Sebastian Schachten (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-11-06 | |||
23 | Marcel Halstenberg (until 2015-08-31) | 1991-09-27 | |||
24 | Florian Mohr (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-08-25 | |||
26 | Soren Gonther (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-12-15 | |||
27 | Jan-Philipp Kalla (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-08-06 | |||
28 | Andrey Startsev (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-06-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Florian Kringe (until 2015-06-30) | 1982-08-18 | |||
7 | Dennis Daube (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-07-11 | |||
10 | Christopher Buchtmann (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-04-25 | |||
11 | Marc Rzatkowski (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-03-02 | |||
17 | Fabian Boll (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-06-16 | |||
22 | Fin Bartels (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-02-07 | |||
25 | Kevin Schindler (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-05-21 | |||
29 | Sebastian Maier (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-09-18 | |||
32 | Fabian Graudenz (from 2013-11-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-01-16 | |||
35 | Tom Trybull (from 2014-01-03) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-03-09 | |||
36 | Okan Kurt (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-01-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Christopher Nothe (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-01-03 | |||
12 | John Verhoek (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-03-25 | |||
18 | Lennart Thy (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-02-25 | |||
19 | Michael Gregoritsch (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-04-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2013-07-19 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-07-27 15:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-08-11 13:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-08-16 20:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2013-08-26 20:15 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-08-31 13:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-09-14 13:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2013-09-23 20:15 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-09-29 13:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-10-04 18:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-10-20 13:30 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-10-25 18:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-11-02 13:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2013-11-11 20:15 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-11-24 13:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-11-29 18:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-12-06 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2013-12-16 20:15 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-12-20 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-02-09 13:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-02-15 13:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-02-23 13:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2014-03-03 20:15 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-09 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-16 13:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-03-22 13:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2014-03-25 17:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-03-28 18:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-04-05 13:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-04-11 18:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2014-04-17 18:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-04-27 13:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-05-04 15:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-05-11 15:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |