Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Norbert Lorz (until 2014-06-30) | 1967-03-01 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Benno Mohlmann (until 2015-05-18) | 1954-08-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Sven Kmetsch (until 2014-06-30) | 1970-08-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Patric Klandt (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-09-29 | |||
21 | Soren Pirson (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-08-27 | |||
24 | Jannis Pellowski (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-06-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Bjorn Schlicke (until 2015-06-30) | 1981-06-23 | |||
4 | Nils Teixeira (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-07-10 | |||
14 | Nestor Djengoue (from 2013-08-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-04-26 | |||
15 | Alexander Huber (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-02-25 | |||
16 | Marc Heitmeier (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-03-18 | |||
17 | Joan Oumari (until 2016-01-10) | 1988-08-19 | |||
31 | Tim Heubach (until 2014-07-14) | 1988-05-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Manuel Konrad (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-04-14 | |||
6 | Joni Kauko (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-07-12 | |||
7 | Marc-Andre Kruska (from 2014-01-03) (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-06-29 | |||
7 | Tufan Tosunoglu (until 2013-09-01) | 1988-07-22 | |||
8 | Michael Gorlitz (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-03-08 | |||
18 | Marcel Kandziora (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-02-04 | |||
22 | Odise Roshi (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-05-22 | |||
23 | Marcel Kaffenberger (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-03-12 | |||
25 | Emre Nefiz (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-11-24 | |||
26 | Denis Epstein (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-07-02 | |||
27 | Ahmed Azaouagh (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-06-20 | |||
30 | Faton Toski (from 2014-01-21) (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-02-17 | |||
37 | Zafer Yelen (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-08-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Edmond Kapllani (until 2016-06-30) | 1982-07-31 | |||
10 | Nikita Rukavytsya (from 2013-09-02) (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-06-22 | |||
11 | Chhunly Pagenburg (until 2015-02-12) | 1986-11-10 | |||
19 | Andrew Wooten (from 2014-01-14) (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-09-30 | |||
19 | Markus Ziereis (until 2014-01-02) | 1992-08-26 | |||
20 | Mathew Leckie (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-02-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2013-07-21 13:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-07-28 13:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-08-09 18:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-08-18 13:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-08-25 13:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-08-30 18:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-09-14 13:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-09-22 13:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-09-28 13:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-10-06 13:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-10-18 18:30 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-10-26 13:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-11-03 13:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-11-08 18:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-11-22 18:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2013-12-02 20:15 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-12-07 13:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-12-15 13:30 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-12-21 13:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-02-07 18:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-02-15 13:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-02-21 18:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-02 13:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-09 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-03-14 18:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-03-22 13:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2014-03-26 17:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-30 13:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-04-04 18:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-04-13 13:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-04-20 13:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-04-26 13:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-05-04 15:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-05-11 15:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |