Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Timo Reus (until 2014-06-30) | 1974-05-02 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Stefan Ruthenbeck (until 2015-06-30) | 1972-04-19 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Schiele (until 2014-06-30) | 1978-03-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Bernhardt (until 2022-06-30) | 1985-08-21 | |||
1 | Daniel Bernhardt (until 2021-06-30) | 1985-08-21 | |||
16 | Jasmin Fejzic (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-05-15 | |||
24 | Marcel Wehr (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-07-15 | |||
31 | Timo Reus (until 2014-06-30) | 1974-05-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Andre Hainault (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-06-17 | |||
4 | Oliver Barth (until 2016-06-30) | 1979-10-06 | |||
5 | Jurgen Mossmer (until 2014-08-11) | 1989-06-11 | |||
6 | Benjamin Hubner (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-07-04 | |||
15 | Daniel Buballa (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-05-11 | |||
17 | Sascha Traut (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-05-21 | |||
25 | Kevin Ruiz (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-06-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Leandro Grech (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-10-14 | |||
11 | Enrico Valentini (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-02-20 | |||
13 | Felix Nierichlo (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-05-14 | |||
14 | Joel Pohjanpalo (from 2013-09-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-09-13 | |||
18 | Maximilian Oesterhelweg (from 2014-01-30) (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-07-21 | |||
20 | Manuel Junglas (until 2015-01-01) | 1989-01-31 | |||
21 | Fabio Kaufmann (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-09-08 | |||
22 | Michael Klauss (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-04-20 | |||
23 | Andreas Hofmann (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-04-13 | |||
29 | Nico Zimmermann (until 2013-08-27) | 1985-09-02 | |||
34 | Daniel Serejo (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-01-23 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Selim Aydemir (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-10-26 | |||
9 | Robert Lechleiter (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-07-01 | |||
10 | Marcel Reichwein (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-02-21 | |||
12 | Cidimar (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-07-01 | |||
19 | Takuma Abe (until 2014-07-14) | 1987-12-05 | |||
28 | Fabian Weiss (until 2015-01-28) | 1992-02-23 | |||
29 | Nejmeddin Daghfous (from 2014-01-30) (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-10-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2013-07-19 18:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-07-26 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-08-11 13:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-08-18 13:30 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-08-24 13:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-09-01 13:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-09-13 18:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-09-21 13:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-09-27 18:40 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-10-05 13:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-10-18 18:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-10-26 13:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-11-01 18:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-11-08 18:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-11-24 13:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-11-29 18:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-12-08 13:30 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2013-12-13 18:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-12-22 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-02-07 18:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-02-16 13:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-02-23 13:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-02 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-03-07 18:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-03-14 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-03-22 13:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2014-03-25 17:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-30 13:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-04-04 18:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-04-13 13:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-04-20 13:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-04-27 13:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-05-04 15:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-05-11 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |