Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Markus Kauczinski (until 2016-06-30) | 1970-02-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dirk Orlishausen (until 2018-06-30) | 1982-08-15 | |||
24 | Rene Vollath (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-03-20 | |||
25 | Florian Stritzel (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-01-31 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Philipp Klingmann (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-04-22 | |||
3 | Daniel Gordon (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-01-16 | |||
4 | Martin Stoll (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-02-09 | |||
6 | Jan Mauersberger (until 2016-02-01) | 1985-06-17 | |||
7 | Sascha Traut (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-05-21 | |||
14 | Manuel Gulde (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-02-12 | |||
20 | Ylli Sallahi (from 2015-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-04-06 | |||
22 | Enrico Valentini (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-02-20 | |||
31 | Philipp Max (until 2015-08-04) | 1993-09-30 | |||
35 | Matthias Bader (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-06-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Reinhold Yabo (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-02-10 | |||
9 | Hiroki Yamada (from 2014-07-24) (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-12-27 | |||
10 | Selcuk Alibaz (until 2015-01-14) | 1989-12-03 | |||
11 | Boubacar Barry (until 2017-08-15) | 1996-04-15 | |||
13 | Dominic Peitz (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-09-11 | |||
16 | Dennis Mast (until 2014-07-28) | 1992-02-15 | |||
18 | Manuel Torres (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-01-05 | |||
21 | Gaetan Krebs (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-11-18 | |||
23 | Jonas Meffert (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-09-04 | |||
26 | Silvano Varnhagen (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-02-04 | |||
30 | Mirko Schuster (until 2015-01-26) | 1994-07-21 | |||
32 | Ernesto de Santis (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-19 | |||
33 | Jung-Bin Park (until 2015-08-31) | 1994-02-22 | |||
34 | Tim Grupp (until 2016-02-01) | 1995-01-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
11 | Dimitrij Nazarov (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-04-04 | |||
17 | Rouwen Hennings (until 2015-08-14) | 1987-08-28 | |||
19 | Ilijan Mizanski (until 2015-07-23) | 1985-12-20 | |||
28 | Koen van der Biezen (until 2015-01-05) | 1985-07-10 | |||
29 | Jimmy Marton (until 2015-01-29) | 1995-08-26 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Dennis Mast (from 2014-07-29) (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-02-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2014-08-03 15:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-08-08 18:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-08-23 13:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-08-30 13:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-09-12 18:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-09-21 13:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2014-09-24 17:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-09-27 13:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-10-04 13:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-10-19 13:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-10-25 13:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-10-31 18:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-11-09 13:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-11-23 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-11-28 18:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-12-07 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-12-13 13:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2014-12-16 17:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-12-19 18:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-02-08 13:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-02-13 18:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2015-02-21 13:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2015-02-28 13:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2015-03-09 20:15 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-03-15 13:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-03-22 13:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-04-05 13:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-04-10 18:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-04-17 18:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2015-04-25 13:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-05-03 13:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2015-05-11 20:15 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-05-17 15:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-05-24 15:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |