Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Alois Schwartz (until 2016-06-30) | 1967-03-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marco Knaller (until 2017-08-30) | 1987-03-26 | |||
22 | Michael Hiegl (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-04-08 | |||
33 | Manuel Riemann (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-09-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Radoslav Zabavnik (until 2014-08-21) | 1980-09-16 | |||
5 | Daniel Schulz (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-02-21 | |||
11 | Moritz Kuhn (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-08-01 | |||
14 | Tim Kister (until 2022-06-30) | 1986-12-30 | |||
17 | Florian Hubner (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-03-01 | |||
19 | Leart Pacarada (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-10-08 | |||
27 | Seyi Olajengbesi (until 2016-06-30) | 1980-11-17 | |||
29 | Eric Schaaf (from 2015-02-02) (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-05-29 | |||
30 | Lukas Kubler (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-08-30 | |||
32 | Timo Achenbach (until 2015-06-30) | 1982-09-03 | |||
34 | Marc Pfertzel (until 2015-06-30) | 1981-05-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Denis Linsmayer (until 2021-07-29) | 1991-09-19 | |||
7 | Marco Thiede (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-05-20 | |||
10 | Robert Zillner (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-08-04 | |||
15 | Alexander Bieler (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-09-05 | |||
18 | Steven Zellner (from 2015-02-02) (until 2017-01-09) | 1991-03-14 | |||
20 | Jim-Patrick Muller (until 2015-01-23) | 1989-08-04 | |||
21 | Manuel Stiefler (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-07-25 | |||
23 | Kevin Kratz (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-01-21 | |||
24 | Nono (from 2015-02-02) (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-03-30 | |||
24 | Simon Tuting (until 2015-02-01) | 1986-09-07 | |||
31 | Stefan Kulovits (until 2020-06-30) | 1983-04-19 | |||
37 | Marvin Knoll (until 2015-01-25) | 1990-12-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Nicky Adler (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-05-23 | |||
9 | Aziz Bouhaddouz (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-03-30 | |||
12 | Andrew Wooten (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-09-30 | |||
13 | Rene Gartler (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-10-21 | |||
20 | Solomon Okoronkwo (from 2015-01-28) (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-03-02 | |||
26 | Ranisav Jovanovic (until 2016-06-30) | 1980-11-05 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Philipp Kuhn (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-03-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2014-08-03 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-08-10 15:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-08-22 18:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-08-31 13:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-09-14 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-09-19 18:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2014-09-23 17:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-09-26 18:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-10-05 13:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2014-10-18 13:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-10-26 13:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-10-31 18:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-11-07 18:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-11-21 18:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-11-30 13:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-12-05 18:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2014-12-12 18:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2014-12-17 17:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-12-21 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2015-02-07 13:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2015-02-14 13:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-02-20 18:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2015-02-28 13:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-03-08 13:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-03-15 13:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-03-20 18:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-04-05 13:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-04-12 13:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-04-17 18:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-04-24 18:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-05-03 13:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-05-08 18:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-05-17 15:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-05-24 15:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |