Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Torsten Lieberknecht (until 2018-06-30) | 1973-08-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marcel Engelhardt (until 2021-01-27) | 1993-04-05 | |||
16 | Jasmin Fejzic (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-05-15 | |||
33 | Rafal Gikiewicz (until 2016-08-05) | 1987-10-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Omar Castro (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-02-17 | ||||
3 | Saulo Decarli (until 2017-08-21) | 1992-02-04 | |||
4 | Joseph Baffo (from 2015-07-26) (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-11-07 | |||
8 | Deniz Dogan (until 2016-06-30) | 1979-10-20 | |||
17 | Phil Ofosu-Ayeh (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-09-15 | |||
19 | Ken Reichel (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-12-19 | |||
24 | Maximilian Sauer (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-05-15 | |||
25 | Marcel Correia (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-05-16 | |||
27 | Niko Kijewski (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-03-28 | |||
28 | Dennis Slamar (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-09-08 | |||
36 | Mohammad Baghdadi (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-10-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Lukas Kierdorf (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-12-20 | ||||
6 | Damir Vrancic (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-10-04 | |||
8 | Adam Matuschyk (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-02-14 | |||
10 | Mirko Boland (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-04-23 | |||
11 | Jan Hochscheidt (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-10-04 | |||
12 | Nik Omladic (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-08-21 | |||
21 | Patrick Schonfeld (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-06-21 | |||
22 | Salim Khelifi (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-01-26 | |||
30 | Hendrick Zuck (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-07-21 | |||
31 | Marc Pfitzner (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-08-28 | |||
38 | Gerrit Holtmann (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Domi Kumbela (from 2016-01-06) (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-04-20 | |||
9 | Emil Berggreen (until 2016-01-31) | 1993-05-10 | |||
18 | Orhan Ademi (until 2016-08-31) | 1991-10-28 | |||
20 | Torsten Oehrl (until 2015-08-31) | 1986-01-07 | |||
23 | Mads Hvilsom (from 2015-07-15) (until 2016-01-07) | 1992-08-23 | |||
26 | Julius Duker (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-01-04 | |||
34 | Phillip Tietz (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-07-09 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Mads Hvilsom (from 2016-01-08) (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-08-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2015-07-26 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-07-31 20:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2015-08-15 13:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-08-21 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-08-30 13:30 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-09-13 13:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-09-20 13:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2015-09-23 17:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2015-09-28 20:15 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-10-04 13:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-10-16 18:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-10-25 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-11-01 13:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-11-08 13:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2015-11-23 20:15 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-11-27 18:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2015-12-07 20:15 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-12-11 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-12-20 13:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-02-07 13:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-02-14 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2016-02-20 13:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-02-28 13:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2016-03-03 20:15 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-03-06 13:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2016-03-11 18:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2016-03-18 18:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2016-04-01 18:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2016-04-08 18:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2016-04-18 20:15 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-04-24 13:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2016-04-30 13:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-05-08 15:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-05-15 15:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |