Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sabrina Gesell (until 2016-06-30) | |||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heiko Kupper (until 2014-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Anna-Marie Mistol (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-09-14 | ||||
Anna Schnelle (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-10-27 | ||||
1 | Lara-Celine Stober (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-10-31 | |||
1 | Stephanie Herkrath (until 2013-12-31) | 1991-04-25 | |||
18 | Anna Wegscheider (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-11-08 | |||
23 | Carina Schluter (from 2014-01-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-11-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Julia Zumdick (from 2013-11-23) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-04-12 | ||||
Laura Kuhlmann (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-03-23 | ||||
Deborah Diekmann (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-12-27 | ||||
3 | Nathalie Bock (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-11-07 | |||
4 | Laura Kill (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-11-22 | |||
6 | Janine Angrick (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-06-06 | |||
7 | Janine Ganser (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-11-23 | |||
13 | Anna Tatenhorst (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-04-28 | |||
19 | Laura Hoffmann (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-08-12 | |||
22 | Carina Grendel (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-09-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ana Schonenberg (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-07-21 | ||||
Laura Kuhn (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-12-21 | ||||
2 | Theresa Gosch (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-09-17 | |||
5 | Jessica Bade (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-05-29 | |||
8 | Daniela Liessem (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-05-08 | |||
8 | Wiebke Neuhaus (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-08-02 | |||
10 | Lisa Josten (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-01-07 | |||
14 | Tiana Kalamanda (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-07-22 | |||
16 | Thomalina Adams (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-07-06 | |||
17 | Laura Kuhn (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-12-21 | |||
21 | Sarah Grunheid (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-09-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Dorthe Hoppius (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-05-22 | |||
11 | Frauke Drews (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-06-20 | |||
12 | Anna Maiwald (from 2014-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-03-13 | |||
17 | Burcu Ozkanca (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-01-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2013-09-08 14:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-09-15 11:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-10-06 14:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-10-13 11:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-10-20 11:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-10-27 14:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-11-03 14:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-11-10 11:00 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-11-23 18:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-12-01 14:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-12-08 11:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-02-23 14:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-02 11:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-16 11:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-23 11:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-30 11:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-04-13 14:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-04-27 14:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-05-04 11:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-05-11 11:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-05-25 14:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-06-01 14:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |