Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Inka Grings (until 2017-06-30) | 1978-10-31 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Meike Kamper (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-04-23 | |||
12 | Anna Sarah Deinert (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-10-16 | |||
23 | Mairav Shamir (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-01-18 | |||
31 | Gaelle Thalmann (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-01-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Isabel Schenk (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-01-08 | |||
5 | Alice Hellfeier (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-10-29 | |||
13 | Elena Hauer (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-02-13 | |||
14 | Frauke Fleischer (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-08-05 | |||
15 | Laura Neboli (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-03-14 | |||
16 | Sandra Betschart (from 2016-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-03-30 | |||
20 | Julia Debitzki (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-06-25 | |||
21 | Marina Himmighofen (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-11-11 | |||
25 | Rahel Kiwic (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-01-05 | |||
33 | Kathleen Radtke (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-01-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Melissa Kess (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-06-14 | ||||
11 | Linda Bresonik (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-12-07 | |||
11 | Sofia Nati (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-04-19 | |||
13 | Danica Wu (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-08-13 | |||
14 | Julide Mirvan (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-01-28 | |||
16 | Carmen Pulver (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-09-18 | |||
17 | Michelle Buning (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-09-18 | |||
21 | Selina Maria Boveleth (from 2016-02-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-03-31 | |||
28 | Zsofia Racz (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-12-28 | |||
30 | Anna-Sophie Fliege (from 2016-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-04-20 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Madeline Gier (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-04-28 | ||||
8 | Laura Ramos (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-08-15 | |||
9 | Lee Falkon (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-05-07 | |||
10 | Sofia Nati (from 2016-06-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-04-19 | |||
15 | Yuna Segawa (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-05-02 | |||
18 | Nicole Munzert (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-11-24 | |||
19 | Stefanie Weichelt (until 2018-06-30) | 1983-08-23 | |||
22 | Lara Hess (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-08-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2015-08-30 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-09-06 11:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-09-13 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-10-11 14:00 |
2 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-10-18 11:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-10-30 18:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-11-15 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-12-06 11:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-12-13 12:00 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-12-20 13:00 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-02-07 11:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-02-14 14:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-02-21 11:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-02-28 14:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-03-13 14:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-03-20 11:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2016-03-28 14:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-04-17 14:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-04-24 14:00 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-05-01 11:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-05-08 14:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-05-15 14:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |