Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Konig (until 2003-12-31) | 1947-05-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Sissy Raith (until 2003-12-31) | 1960-06-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Christine Francke (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-06-12 | |||
1 | Kathrin Lehmann (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-02-27 | |||
21 | Ulrike Schmetz (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-10-30 | |||
24 | Christine Francke (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-06-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Janine Partzsch (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-02-02 | ||||
2 | Johanna Loistl (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-07-14 | |||
5 | Dagmar Urbancova (until 2007-12-31) | 1983-05-23 | |||
11 | Sabine Loderer (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-03-18 | |||
12 | Claudia Kierner (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-09-05 | |||
13 | Carmen Roth (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-01-02 | |||
14 | Angelika Seidl (from 2003-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1986-03-23 | |||
16 | Josefine Krengel (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-05-31 | |||
23 | Sandra de Pol (until 2011-06-30) | 1975-05-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Mareike Mende (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1985-08-14 | |||
4 | Gertrud Stallinger (until 2004-06-30) | 1967-11-23 | |||
6 | Susanne Eigner (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-10-01 | |||
7 | Tanja Worle (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-07-06 | |||
8 | Simone Laudehr (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1986-07-12 | |||
10 | Sonja Spieler (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-05-27 | |||
14 | Adriane Radtke (until 2003-06-30) | 1983-03-18 | |||
15 | Katja Wittfoth (until 2003-12-31) | 1971-05-04 | |||
16 | Silvia Parra Labalsa (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-09-29 | |||
17 | Kerstin Hoffmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-11-04 | |||
20 | Silvia Parra Labalsa (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-09-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
3 | Felicia Notbom (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-04-03 | |||
9 | Katja Illenberger (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-01-21 | |||
9 | Rina Rolinski (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-09-14 | |||
18 | Nina Aigner (until 2011-03-31) | 1980-06-20 | |||
20 | Kim Rogers (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-05-15 | |||
22 | Katharina Griessemer (from 2003-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1986-07-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2003-09-14 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2003-09-21 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2003-09-28 00:00 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2003-10-11 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |