Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Dirk Heinrichs (from 2003-07-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1968-05-20 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Schroder (until 2016-06-30) | 1942-07-22 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dirk Heinrichs (from 2003-07-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-05-20 | ||||
Sven Thoss (until 2004-06-30) | 1966-07-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lena Hohlfeld (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-12-02 | |||
23 | Stephanie Ullrich (from 2003-07-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-07-29 | |||
25 | Nadine Angerer (until 2007-12-31) | 1978-11-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Madleen Wilder (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-07-06 | |||
5 | Maria Makowska (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-01-25 | |||
7 | Franziska Nickel (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-06-06 | |||
8 | Inken Beeken (from 2003-07-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-09-02 | |||
12 | Kathleen Radtke (until 2003-06-30) | 1985-01-31 | |||
14 | Jennifer Zietz (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-09-14 | |||
15 | Franziska Liepack (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-09-10 | |||
17 | Ariane Hingst (until 2007-03-31) | 1979-07-25 | |||
21 | Peggy Kuznik (until 2007-12-31) | 1986-08-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Anika Machalett (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-06-17 | ||||
6 | Navina Omilade (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-11-03 | |||
10 | Annelie Brendel (until 2005-12-31) | 1983-09-24 | |||
11 | Diana Staat (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-03-19 | |||
18 | Viola Odebrecht (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-02-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Aferdita Podvorica (from 2003-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-09-10 | ||||
8 | Anja Mittag (until 2003-06-30) | 1985-05-16 | |||
9 | Conny Pohlers (from 2003-09-16) (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-11-16 | |||
9 | Conny Pohlers (until 2003-05-15) | 1978-11-16 | |||
13 | Jana Schadrack (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-12-27 | |||
16 | Jana Schadrack (from 2003-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-12-27 | |||
19 | Marina Lis (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-08-25 | |||
20 | Petra Wimbersky (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-11-09 | |||
22 | Aferdita Podvorica (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-09-10 | |||
23 | Stefanie Beltz (until 2003-06-30) | 1985-11-29 | |||
31 | Anja Mittag (from 2003-07-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-05-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2003-09-14 00:00 |
7 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2003-09-21 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2003-09-28 00:00 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2003-10-11 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |