Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Bosz (until 2021-03-22) | 1963-11-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Tomasz Kucz (until 2019-07-31) | 1999-07-06 | ||||
1 | Lukas Hradecky | 1989-11-24 | |||
28 | Ramazan Ozcan (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-06-28 | |||
36 | Niklas Lomb | 1993-07-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Panagiotis Retsos (until 2020-01-31) | 1998-08-09 | |||
4 | Jonathan Tah | 1996-02-11 | |||
5 | Sven Bender (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
6 | Aleksandar Dragovic (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-03-06 | |||
12 | Edmond Tapsoba (from 2020-01-31) | 1999-02-02 | |||
16 | Tin Jedvaj (until 2019-08-20) | 1995-11-28 | |||
18 | Wendell (until 2021-08-20) | 1993-07-20 | |||
22 | Daley Sinkgraven (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-07-04 | |||
23 | Mitchell Weiser (until 2021-08-31) | 1994-04-21 | |||
33 | Jan Boller (until 2019-07-31) | 2000-03-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Lars Bender (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
10 | Kerem Demirbay (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-07-03 | |||
11 | Nadiem Amiri (from 2019-07-30) (until 2022-01-29) | 1996-10-27 | |||
15 | Julian Baumgartlinger (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-01-02 | |||
20 | Charles Aranguiz (until 2023-04-03) | 1989-04-17 | |||
25 | Exequiel Palacios (from 2020-01-01) | 1998-10-05 | |||
27 | Florian Wirtz (from 2020-05-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 2003-05-03 | |||
29 | Kai Havertz (until 2020-09-03) | 1999-06-11 | |||
30 | Adrian Stanilewicz (until 2020-08-30) | 2000-02-22 | |||
32 | Ayman Azhil (until 2020-08-31) | 2001-04-10 | |||
38 | Karim Bellarabi (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-04-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Paulinho (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-07-15 | |||
9 | Leon Bailey (until 2021-08-03) | 1997-08-09 | |||
13 | Lucas Alario (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-10-08 | |||
17 | Joel Pohjanpalo (until 2020-01-24) | 1994-09-13 | |||
19 | Moussa Diaby (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-07-07 | |||
31 | Kevin Volland (until 2020-09-01) | 1992-07-30 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Tin Jedvaj (from 2019-08-20) (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-11-28 | ||||
Joel Pohjanpalo (from 2020-01-24) (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-09-13 | ||||
Panagiotis Retsos (from 2020-01-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-08-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2019-07-06 17:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2019-07-13 14:55 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2019-07-13 17:00 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2019-07-20 18:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2019-07-28 15:00 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2019-07-28 17:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2019-08-04 14:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2020-01-10 14:00 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2020-01-10 16:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |