Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Daniyel Cimen (until 2024-09-01) | 1985-01-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Frederic Lohe (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-08-12 | |||
1 | Frederic Lohe (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-08-12 | |||
31 | Nils Ellenfeld (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-06-22 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Sascha Heil (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-05-04 | |||
4 | Kevin Nennhuber (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-04-11 | |||
5 | Jure Colak (from 2019-07-03) (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-08-21 | |||
5 | Christopher Schadeberg (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-06-11 | |||
15 | Samuel Sesay (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-08-29 | |||
22 | Ricardo Antonaci (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-03-11 | |||
24 | Vaclav Koutny (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-10-04 | |||
25 | Alban Lekaj (until 2020-01-13) | 1994-01-04 | |||
27 | Andrej Markovic (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-06-14 | |||
30 | Kevin Pezzoni (from 2020-01-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-03-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Luca Teller (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-06-15 | ||||
Manuel Konate-Lueken (from 2020-01-02) (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-01-11 | ||||
6 | Johannes Hofmann (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-03-12 | |||
7 | Brian Mukasa (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-04-06 | |||
8 | Donny Bogicevic (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-10-08 | |||
8 | Tim Korzuschek (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-08-26 | |||
8 | Timo Cecen (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-05-17 | |||
10 | Cem Kara (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-12-31 | |||
11 | Marco Koch (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-10-27 | |||
16 | Nico Rinderknecht (from 2019-07-22) (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-10-11 | |||
18 | Christopher Spang (until 2020-08-31) | 1993-01-29 | |||
28 | Samir Benamar (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-08-23 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Giuseppe Burgio (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-09-28 | ||||
9 | Aykut Ozturk (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-11-07 | |||
9 | Aykut Ozturk (until 2021-06-30) | 1987-11-07 | |||
20 | Noah Michel (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-05-23 | |||
21 | Jann Bangert (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-04-20 | |||
29 | Jake Hirst (from 2019-08-31) (until 2020-08-04) | 1996-05-05 | |||
33 | Dimitrios Ferfelis (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-04-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2019-10-10 16:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |