Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ismail Atalan (until 2020-02-25) | 1980-04-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Alexander Eiban (until 2021-01-19) | 1994-05-05 | |||
33 | Jhonny Peitzmeier (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-11-04 | |||
33 | Yannick Zummack (until 2019-12-25) | 1996-03-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Besfort Kolgeci (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-01-05 | |||
5 | Matthias Rahn (until 2020-01-04) | 1990-05-17 | |||
7 | Fabian Gmeiner (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-01-27 | |||
21 | Dennis Engel (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-10-20 | |||
23 | Alexander Langlitz (until 2020-08-03) | 1991-02-15 | |||
25 | Jeron Al-Hazaimeh (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-02-13 | |||
26 | Noah Awassi (until 2019-09-02) | 1998-03-10 | |||
27 | Filip Lisnic (from 2019-07-08) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-02-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Tim Wendel (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-01-12 | |||
6 | Tim Moller (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-03-19 | |||
8 | Erhan Yilmaz (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-08-16 | |||
10 | Leon Demaj (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-11-28 | |||
11 | Marcell Sobotta (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-02-07 | |||
15 | Jules Reimerink (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-09-30 | |||
16 | Timo Brauer (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-05-30 | |||
32 | Gianluca Przondziono (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-01-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Nelson Mandela Mbouhom (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-05-04 | ||||
19 | Kevin Freiberger (from 2019-08-02) (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-11-16 | |||
21 | Jegor Jagupov (from 2019-07-24) (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-12-26 | |||
24 | Jaroslaw Lindner (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-06-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2020-01-04 13:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |