Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Alexander Voigt (from 2019-10-18) (until 2020-12-02) | 1978-04-13 | ||||
Pascal Bieler (from 2020-01-21) (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-02-26 | ||||
Andreas Zimmermann (until 2019-10-18) | 1969-12-28 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Karsten Hutwelker (from 2019-10-01) (until 2019-12-31) | 1971-08-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Florian Kraft (from 2020-01-01) (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-08-04 | ||||
1 | Niklas Lubcke (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-08-04 | |||
30 | Edin Pepic (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-07-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
5 | Tjorben Uphoff (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-09-08 | |||
13 | Nick Osygus (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-12-10 | |||
15 | Tom Meurer (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-03-23 | |||
18 | Yusa-Semih Alabas (until 2020-01-15) | 1999-12-31 | |||
20 | Silvio Pagano (from 2019-09-03) (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-09-12 | |||
21 | Noah Salau (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-05-29 | |||
22 | Tolga Cokkosan (from 2020-01-08) (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-04-06 | |||
27 | Kevin Pytlik (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-11-14 | |||
33 | Dennis Malura (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-06-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Luka Sola (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-02-03 | ||||
Danny Kierath (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-10-15 | ||||
4 | Daniel Nesseler (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-03-15 | |||
6 | Meik Kuhnel (until 2020-01-05) | 1995-01-26 | |||
7 | Semir Saric (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-09-08 | |||
8 | Daniel Grebe (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-03-03 | |||
11 | Ali Ceylan (from 2020-01-01) (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-06-17 | |||
17 | Lukas Knechtel (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-07-09 | |||
19 | Arjan Duraj (from 2019-07-13) (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-09-24 | |||
20 | Jan-Steffen Meier (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-05-30 | |||
23 | Viktor Maier (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-08-26 | |||
23 | Nedim Pepic (until 2020-01-27) | 1997-12-23 | |||
24 | Isaak Simion Akritidis (from 2020-01-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 2002-04-10 | |||
31 | Hassine Refai (from 2020-01-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-07-30 | |||
33 | Yannick Geisler (from 2020-01-15) (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-09-23 | |||
33 | Joey Paul Muller (from 2019-07-24) (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-08-30 | |||
33 | Karoj Sindi (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-08-21 | |||
34 | Leonard Bajraktari (from 2019-11-01) (until 2020-06-30) | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Mohamed El Bakali (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-03-05 | ||||
9 | Beyhan Ametov (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-11-07 | |||
9 | Kevin Hagemann (until 2019-07-07) | 1990-11-05 | |||
11 | Ufumwen Osawe (until 2020-01-15) | 1998-06-02 | |||
18 | Marwin Studtrucker (from 2020-01-17) (until 2021-01-31) | 1990-04-29 | |||
26 | Gianluca Marzullo (until 2021-01-29) | 1991-01-04 | |||
29 | Mohamed Achouird Fatni (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-04-17 | |||
42 | Mike Osenberg (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-01-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2019-07-06 17:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |