Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerhard Kleppinger (from 2021-02-16) (until 2021-09-20) | 1958-03-01 | ||||
Stefan Kulovits (from 2021-02-16) (until 2021-06-30) | 1983-04-19 | ||||
Michael Schiele (from 2020-11-26) (until 2021-02-15) | 1978-03-03 | ||||
Uwe Koschinat (until 2020-11-24) | 1971-09-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Stefanos Kapino (from 2021-01-21) (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-03-18 | ||||
1 | Martin Fraisl (until 2020-12-27) | 1993-05-10 | |||
13 | Rick Wulle (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-06-04 | |||
15 | Philipp Heerwagen (until 2021-06-30) | 1983-04-13 | |||
40 | Benedikt Grawe (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-02-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Alexander Schirow (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-01-24 | |||
3 | Diego Contento (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-05-01 | |||
14 | Tim Kister (until 2022-06-30) | 1986-12-30 | |||
18 | Dennis Diekmeier (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-10-20 | |||
22 | Gerrit Nauber (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-04-13 | |||
23 | Nils Roseler (until 2021-08-16) | 1992-02-10 | |||
24 | Philipp Klingmann (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-04-22 | |||
26 | Janik Bachmann (from 2021-01-28) (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-05-06 | |||
30 | Soren Dieckmann (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-01-16 | |||
33 | Alexander Rossipal (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-06-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Marlon Frey (until 2021-01-20) | 1996-03-24 | |||
6 | Denis Linsmayer (until 2021-07-29) | 1991-09-19 | |||
7 | Philip Turpitz (until 2021-01-31) | 1991-08-23 | |||
17 | Erik Zenga (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-01-18 | |||
19 | Nikolas Nartey (from 2020-07-31) (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-02-22 | |||
20 | Emanuel Taffertshofer (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-02-24 | |||
21 | Enrique Pena Zauner (until 2021-08-04) | 2000-03-04 | |||
22 | Marcel Ritzmaier (from 2021-05-08) (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-04-22 | |||
25 | Florian Hansch (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-08-22 | |||
26 | Besar Halimi (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-12-12 | |||
27 | Robin Scheu (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-02-16 | |||
29 | Ivan Paurevic (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-07-01 | |||
37 | Anas Ouahim (from 2020-08-01) (until 2021-01-27) | 1997-09-23 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Patrick Schmidt (from 2021-01-21) (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-09-10 | ||||
Nikos Zografakis (from 2021-02-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-07-07 | ||||
8 | Mario Engels (until 2020-10-04) | 1993-10-22 | |||
9 | Daniel Keita-Ruel (from 2020-07-31) (until 2022-02-17) | 1989-09-21 | |||
10 | Julius Biada (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-11-03 | |||
11 | Aziz Bouhaddouz (until 2021-02-01) | 1987-03-30 | |||
16 | Kevin Behrens (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-02-03 | |||
35 | Alexander Esswein (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-03-25 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Anas Ouahim (from 2021-01-28) (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-09-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2020-08-08 11:00 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2020-08-22 14:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2020-09-06 16:15 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2020-11-12 13:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |