Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Alexander Ende (until 2022-06-30) | 1979-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Andre Weis (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-09-30 | |||
32 | Paul Schunemann (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-05-22 | |||
33 | Felix Buer (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-03-01 | |||
33 | Felix Buer (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-03-01 | |||
34 | Hannes Daniel Kramp (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-03-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Soren Dieckmann (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-01-16 | |||
4 | Dominik Lanius (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-28 | |||
4 | Dominik Lanius (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-28 | |||
5 | Jan-Luca Rumpf (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-07-08 | |||
17 | Dan-Patrick Poggenberg (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-03-28 | |||
20 | Pascal Itter (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-04-03 | |||
23 | Seymour Funger (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-05-18 | |||
29 | Jean Nadjombe (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-09-06 | |||
30 | Jannik Lohden (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-07-16 | |||
44 | Albin Thaqi (from 2022-01-31) (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-03-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Sascha Marquet (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-11-07 | |||
8 | Stipe Batarilo (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-11-17 | |||
8 | Daniel Lingen (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-11-24 | |||
9 | Leon Demaj (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-11-28 | |||
10 | Maik Kegel (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-12-08 | |||
10 | Maik Kegel (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-12-08 | |||
13 | Andre Dej (from 2022-01-25) (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-02-06 | |||
15 | Kai Försterling Bèltran (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-11-06 | |||
21 | Suheyel Najar (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-10-13 | |||
25 | Timo Holscher (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-06-11 | |||
25 | Timo Holscher (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-06-11 | |||
31 | Nico Brandenburger (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-01-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Leon Demaj (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-11-28 | |||
11 | Francis Ubabuike (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-11-17 | |||
14 | Mike Owusu (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-05-20 | |||
19 | Batuhan Ozden (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-09-26 | |||
22 | KI-Hoon Kim (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-06-26 | |||
27 | Ismail Harnafi (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-02-04 | |||
28 | Dimitry Imbongo Boele (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-03-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2021-07-09 18:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2021-10-08 17:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |