Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dieter Hecking (from 2023-02-20) (until 2023-06-30) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Markus Weinzierl (from 2022-10-04) (until 2023-02-20) | 1974-12-28 | ||||
Robert Klauss (until 2022-10-03) | 1984-12-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ersan Parlatan (from 2022-09-03) (until 2022-10-11) | 1977-08-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Nikolai Kemlein (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-07-12 | ||||
1 | Carl Klaus (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-01-16 | |||
26 | Christian Mathenia | 1992-03-31 | |||
30 | Peter Vindahl Jensen (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-02-16 | |||
31 | Jan Reichert (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-06-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jannik Hofmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-28 | ||||
4 | James Lawrence (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-08-22 | |||
4 | Asger Sorensen (until 2022-07-20) | 1996-06-05 | |||
13 | Erik Wekesser (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-07-03 | |||
16 | Christopher Schindler (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-04-29 | |||
19 | Florian Hubner (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-03-01 | |||
21 | Florian Flick (from 2022-12-08) (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-05-01 | |||
22 | Enrico Valentini | 1989-02-20 | |||
28 | Jan Gyamerah (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-06-18 | |||
29 | Tim-Henry Handwerker (until 2024-01-24) | 1998-05-19 | |||
38 | Jannes Horn (from 2023-01-09) (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-02-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Can Uzun (from 2023-03-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-11-11 | ||||
3 | Sadik Fofana (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-05-16 | |||
5 | Johannes Geis (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-08-17 | |||
6 | Lino Tempelmann (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-02-02 | |||
8 | Taylan Duman | 1997-07-30 | |||
11 | Erik Shuranov (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-22 | |||
15 | Fabian Nurnberger (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-07-28 | |||
16 | Adam Gnezda Cerin (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-07-16 | |||
17 | Jens Castrop (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-29 | |||
23 | Kwadwo Duah (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-02-24 | |||
24 | Mats Moller Daehli (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-03-02 | |||
32 | Louis Breunig (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-11-14 | |||
34 | Bryang Kayo (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-07-27 | |||
35 | Nathaniel Brown (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-06-16 | |||
36 | Lukas Schleimer | 1999-12-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Manuel Wintzheimer (until 2023-01-07) | 1999-01-10 | ||||
7 | Felix Lohkemper (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-01-26 | |||
9 | Danny Blum (from 2023-01-20) (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-01-07 | |||
14 | Benjamin Goller (from 2022-12-12) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-01-01 | |||
20 | Pascal Kopke (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-09-03 | |||
25 | Marc Blum (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-01-14 | |||
27 | Jermain Nischalke (from 2022-12-15) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-26 | |||
33 | Christoph Daferner (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-01-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 2023-01-10 13:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |