Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Fabian Hurzeler (from 2022-12-23) (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-02-26 | ||||
Timo Schultz (until 2022-12-06) | 1977-08-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Nemeth (from 2023-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 1972-09-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Sascha Burchert (from 2022-08-08) (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-10-30 | ||||
1 | Dennis Smarsch (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-01-14 | |||
22 | Nikola Vasilj | 1995-12-02 | |||
28 | Soren Ahlers (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-09-09 | |||
30 | Sascha Burchert (from 2022-08-08) (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-10-30 | |||
40 | Jhonny Peitzmeier (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-11-04 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Monalis Saliakas (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-09-12 | |||
3 | Karol Mets (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-05-16 | |||
4 | David Nemeth (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-18 | |||
5 | Betim Fazliji (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-04-25 | |||
6 | Christopher Avevor (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-02-11 | |||
15 | Marcel Beifus (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-10-27 | |||
18 | Jakov Medic (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-09-07 | |||
19 | Luca Zander (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-08-09 | |||
20 | Yi-Young Park (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-06-29 | |||
21 | Lars Ritzka (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-05-07 | |||
23 | Leart Pacarada (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-10-08 | |||
25 | Adam Dźwigała (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-09-25 | |||
29 | Niklas Jessen (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-09-04 | |||
32 | Jannes Wieckhoff (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-08-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Jackson Irvine (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-03-07 | |||
8 | Eric Smith | 1997-01-08 | |||
10 | Christopher Buchtmann (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-04-25 | |||
13 | Lukas Daschner (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-10-01 | |||
14 | Afeez Aremu (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-10-03 | |||
16 | Carlo Boukhalfa (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-05-03 | |||
24 | Connor Metcalfe | 1999-11-05 | |||
26 | Elias Saad (from 2022-12-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-12-27 | |||
30 | Marcel Hartel (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-01-19 | |||
31 | Franz Roggow (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-07-14 | |||
34 | Igor Matanovic (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-31 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Maurides (from 2023-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-03-10 | |||
9 | Maurides (from 2022-12-15) (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-03-10 | |||
11 | Johannes Eggestein (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-05-08 | |||
14 | Etienne Amenyido (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-03-01 | |||
16 | Simon Makienok (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-11-21 | |||
17 | Oladapo Afolayan (from 2023-01-20) (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-09-11 | |||
27 | David Otto (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2022-12-21 13:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-01-14 14:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |