Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Christoph Dabrowski | 1978-07-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Lars Fleischer (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-09-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jakob Golz | 1998-08-16 | |||
25 | Raphael Koczor (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-01-17 | |||
35 | Felix Wienand | 2002-06-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Moritz Romling (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-04-30 | |||
3 | Felix Herzenbruch (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-08-08 | |||
4 | Felix Bastians (until 2023-11-09) | 1988-05-09 | |||
14 | Daniel Heber (until 2023-01-24) | 1994-07-04 | |||
19 | Michel Niemeyer (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-11-19 | |||
21 | Sandro Plechaty (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-08-24 | |||
23 | Jose-Enrique Rios Alonso | 2000-08-13 | |||
24 | Felix Gotze (from 2022-08-29) (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-05-01 | |||
27 | Sascha Voelcke (until 2023-01-27) | 2002-02-23 | |||
28 | Meiko Sponsel (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Timur Mehmet Kesim (until 2022-07-20) | 2003-09-20 | ||||
5 | Clemens Fandrich (from 2022-08-26) (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-01-10 | |||
6 | Bjorn Rother (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-07-29 | |||
7 | Andreas Wiegel (from 2022-08-30) (until 2024-08-30) | 1991-07-21 | |||
7 | Luca Durholtz (until 2022-08-25) | 1993-08-18 | |||
8 | Cedrick Harenbrock (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-04-19 | |||
10 | Kevin Holzweiler (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-10-16 | |||
16 | Mustafa Kourouma | 2003-01-09 | |||
17 | Erolind Krasniqi (until 2023-01-25) | 2000-03-15 | |||
18 | Lawrence Ennali (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-03-07 | |||
26 | Torben Musel (from 2023-01-30) | 1999-07-25 | |||
31 | Niklas Tarnat (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-05-26 | |||
32 | Thomas Eisfeld (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-01-18 | |||
33 | Nico Haiduk (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-12 | |||
38 | Oguzhan Kefkir (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-08-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Ron Berlinski (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-08-08 | |||
11 | Simon Engelmann (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-03-22 | |||
13 | Luca Wollschlager (from 2022-09-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-02-08 | |||
22 | Aurel Loubongo-M'Boungou (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-06-19 | |||
30 | Isaiah Young (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-03-30 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Fabian Ruth (from 2022-08-31) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-07-02 | ||||
Erolind Krasniqi (from 2023-01-25) (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-03-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2022-07-01 19:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |