Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Alexander Zorniger (until 2023-06-30) | 1967-10-08 | ||||
Marc Schneider (until 2022-10-14) | 1980-07-23 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Rainer Widmayer (from 2022-10-14) (until 2022-12-31) | 1967-04-02 | ||||
Stefan Kleineheismann (from 2022-10-14) (until 2022-12-31) | 1988-02-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lasse Schulz (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-29 | |||
25 | Leon Schaffran (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-07-31 | |||
26 | Andreas Linde (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-07-24 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Damian Michalski (from 2022-08-29) | 1998-05-17 | ||||
Oualid Mhamdi | 2003-05-20 | ||||
Oliver Fobassam Nawe (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-04-06 | ||||
Natanas Zebrauskas (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-18 | ||||
Oussama Haddadi (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-01-28 | ||||
2 | Simon Asta | 2001-01-25 | |||
15 | Jetro Willems (until 2022-08-31) | 1994-03-30 | |||
18 | Marco Meyerhofer | 1995-11-18 | |||
27 | Gian-Luca Itter | 1999-01-05 | |||
32 | Abdourahmane Barry (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-02-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ben Schlicke (from 2023-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-10-31 | ||||
Sidney Raebiger (until 2023-09-01) | 2005-04-17 | ||||
Marco John (from 2022-08-26) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-04-02 | ||||
Nils Seufert (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-02-03 | ||||
Lucien Littbarski (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-05-08 | ||||
Lukas Petkov (from 2023-01-31) (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-11-01 | ||||
Maximilian Dietz (from 2023-01-25) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-09 | ||||
13 | Max Christiansen (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-09-25 | |||
20 | Tobias Raschl (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-02-21 | |||
21 | Timothy Tillman (until 2023-02-10) | 1999-01-04 | |||
22 | Sebastian Griesbeck (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-10-03 | |||
23 | Gideon Jung | 1994-09-12 | |||
28 | Jeremy Dudziak (until 2023-01-27) | 1995-08-28 | |||
31 | Devin Angleberger (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-05 | |||
34 | Denis Pfaffenrot (from 2023-03-20) | 2005-03-18 | |||
37 | Julian Green | 1995-06-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Armindo Sieb (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-02-17 | ||||
Ragnar Ache (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-07-28 | ||||
7 | Robin Kehr (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-02-22 | |||
9 | Afimico Pululu (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-23 | |||
10 | Branimir Hrgota | 1993-01-12 | |||
19 | Dickson Abiama (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-11-03 | |||
verliehen | |||||
28 | Jeremy Dudziak (from 2023-01-27) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-08-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 2022-12-20 14:00 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |