Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Fuat Kilic (from 2023-03-12) | 1973-05-09 | ||||
Frank Loning (from 2023-03-05) (until 2024-03-12) | 1981-08-28 | ||||
Dario Fossi (until 2023-03-05) | 1981-05-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dominik Kisiel (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-04-15 | |||
25 | Felix Dornebusch (from 2023-01-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-07-12 | |||
26 | Pelle Boevink (until 2022-12-29) | 1998-01-06 | |||
28 | Moritz Ben Onken (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-08-01 | |||
49 | Sebastian Mielitz (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-07-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Maik Stöver (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-06-11 | |||
3 | Marcel Appiah (until 2024-06-30) | 1988-03-26 | |||
4 | Leon Deichmann | 1997-02-24 | |||
5 | Fabian Herbst (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-05-21 | |||
8 | Robert Zietarski (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-06-20 | |||
22 | Dennis Engel (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-10-20 | |||
27 | Ebrima-Dominique Ndure (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-10-25 | |||
31 | Justin Plautz (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-04-09 | |||
32 | Oliver Steurer (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-01-06 | |||
44 | Nico Knystock | 1995-10-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Manfred Starke (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-02-21 | |||
7 | Rafael Brand (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-09-09 | |||
10 | Gazi Siala (until 2022-07-25) | 1994-11-09 | |||
11 | Ayodele Adetula (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-02-09 | |||
12 | Linus Schäfer (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-06-06 | |||
13 | Marten-Heiko Schmidt (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-01-24 | |||
16 | Marc Stendera (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-12-10 | |||
17 | Patrick Moschl (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-03-06 | |||
18 | Pascal Richter | 1996-10-10 | |||
19 | Christopher Buchtmann (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-04-25 | |||
20 | Jakob Bookjans (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-07-21 | |||
21 | Sotirios Kaissis (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-11-07 | |||
24 | Kebba Badjie (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-08-22 | |||
33 | Kamer Krasniqi (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-01-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Max Wegner (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-03-24 | |||
23 | Marco Schultz (until 2023-01-31) | 1992-02-11 | |||
29 | Orhan Ademi (from 2023-01-31) (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-10-28 | |||
30 | Affamefuna-Michael Ifeadigo (until 2023-01-25) | 1996-07-13 | |||
45 | Patrick Hasenhuttl (from 2022-09-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-05-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2023-01-07 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |