Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bo Henriksen (from 2024-02-13) | 1975-02-07 | ||||
Jan Siewert (from 2023-11-17) (until 2024-02-12) | 1982-08-23 | ||||
Bo Svensson (until 2023-11-02) | 1979-08-04 | ||||
Babak Keyhanfar (from 2023-08-12) (until 2023-08-13) | 1985-04-20 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Jan Siewert (from 2023-11-02) (until 2023-11-16) | 1982-08-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lasse Riess | 2001-07-27 | |||
27 | Robin Zentner | 1994-10-28 | |||
33 | Daniel Batz | 1991-01-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Sepp van den Berg (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-12-20 | ||||
Tim Müller (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-09-23 | ||||
2 | Phillipp Mwene | 1994-01-29 | |||
5 | Maxim Leitsch | 1998-05-18 | |||
16 | Stefan Bell | 1991-08-24 | |||
19 | Anthony Caci | 1997-07-01 | |||
20 | Edimilson Fernandes (until 2024-08-30) | 1996-04-15 | |||
21 | Danny da Costa | 1993-07-13 | |||
24 | Dimitri Lavalée (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-01-13 | |||
25 | Andreas Hanche-Olsen | 1997-01-17 | |||
30 | Silvan Widmer | 1993-03-05 | |||
47 | Lasse Wilhelm (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-03-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Aymen Barkok (until 2024-01-18) | 1998-05-21 | |||
6 | Anton Stach (until 2023-09-01) | 1998-11-15 | |||
7 | Jae-Sung Lee | 1992-08-10 | |||
8 | Leandro Barreiro Martins (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-01-03 | |||
14 | Tom Krauss (until 2024-08-22) | 2001-06-22 | |||
18 | Nadiem Amiri (from 2024-01-31) | 1996-10-27 | |||
23 | Josuha Guilavogui (from 2023-09-27) (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-09-19 | |||
24 | Merveille Papela (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-01-18 | |||
31 | Dominik Kohr | 1994-01-31 | |||
41 | Eniss Shabani | 2003-05-29 | |||
47 | Maxim Bora Dal (from 2024-02-21) | 2006-01-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Anwar El Ghazi (from 2023-09-22) (until 2023-11-03) | 1995-05-03 | ||||
9 | Karim Onisiwo | 1992-03-17 | |||
10 | Marco Richter (from 2023-08-22) (until 2024-08-28) | 1997-11-24 | |||
18 | Jessic Ngankam (from 2024-01-31) (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-07-20 | |||
29 | Jonathan Burkardt | 2000-07-11 | |||
37 | Delano Burgzorg (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-11-07 | |||
37 | Delano Burgzorg (until 2023-08-17) | 1998-11-07 | |||
43 | Brajan Gruda | 2004-05-31 | |||
44 | Nelson Weiper | 2005-03-17 | |||
45 | David Mamutovic (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-12-05 | |||
48 | Marcus Müller (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-08-20 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Niklas Tauer (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-02-17 | ||||
Ben Bobzien (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-04-29 | ||||
Delano Burgzorg (from 2023-08-17) (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-11-07 | ||||
Aymen Barkok (from 2024-01-18) (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-05-21 | ||||
17 | Ludovic Ajorque | 1994-02-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2023-07-07 19:00 |
0 : 16 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2023-07-14 19:00 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-08-01 16:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-08-05 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-09-09 15:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-10-14 13:30 |
0 : 13 |
Schema Compare |