Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Tuchel (until 2024-06-30) | 1973-08-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Zsolt Low (until 2024-06-30) | 1979-04-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Manuel Neuer | 1986-03-27 | |||
18 | Daniel Daniel (from 2023-08-25) | 2000-07-10 | |||
26 | Sven Ulreich | 1988-08-03 | |||
27 | Yann Sommer (until 2023-08-07) | 1988-12-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Dayot Upamecano | 1998-10-27 | |||
3 | Min-Jae Kim | 1996-11-15 | |||
4 | Matthijs de Ligt (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-08-12 | |||
5 | Benjamin Pavard (until 2023-08-31) | 1996-03-28 | |||
15 | Eric Dier (from 2024-01-11) | 1994-01-15 | |||
19 | Alphonso Davies | 2000-11-02 | |||
20 | Bouna Sarr (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-01-31 | |||
22 | Raphael Guerreiro | 1993-12-22 | |||
23 | Sacha Boey (from 2024-01-28) | 2000-09-13 | |||
28 | Tarek Buchmann (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-28 | |||
40 | Noussair Mazraoui (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-11-14 | |||
41 | Matteo Perez Vinloef (from 2024-05-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-12-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Max Scholze (from 2024-05-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-30 | ||||
Taichi Fukui (until 2023-07-30) | 2004-07-15 | ||||
6 | Joshua Kimmich | 1995-02-08 | |||
8 | Leon Goretzka | 1995-02-06 | |||
17 | Bryan Zaragoza (from 2024-02-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-09-09 | |||
27 | Konrad Laimer | 1997-05-27 | |||
38 | Ryan Gravenberch (until 2023-09-01) | 2002-05-16 | |||
39 | Mathys Tel | 2005-04-27 | |||
42 | Jamal Musiala | 2003-02-26 | |||
45 | Aleksandar Pavlović (from 2023-11-01) | 2004-05-03 | |||
46 | Arijon Ibrahimovic (until 2023-09-01) | 2005-12-11 | |||
48 | Adam Aznou Ben Cheikh (from 2024-05-01) | 2006-06-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Frans Kratzig (until 2024-02-06) | 2003-01-14 | ||||
7 | Serge Gnabry | 1995-07-14 | |||
9 | Harry Kane | 1993-07-28 | |||
10 | Leroy Sane | 1996-01-11 | |||
13 | Eric Maxim Choupo-Moting (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-03-23 | |||
17 | Sadio Mane (until 2023-08-01) | 1992-04-10 | |||
25 | Thomas Muller | 1989-09-13 | |||
29 | Kingsley Coman (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-06-13 | |||
34 | Lovro Zvonarek (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-05-08 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Gabriel Vidovic (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-12-01 | ||||
Johannes Schenk (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-01-13 | ||||
Jamie Lawrence (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-11-10 | ||||
Josip Stanisic (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-04-02 | ||||
Malik Tillman (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-05-28 | ||||
14 | Paul Wanner (from 2023-09-01) | 2005-12-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2023-07-26 12:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-07-29 12:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2023-08-02 13:30 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2023-08-07 17:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2024-01-06 15:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |