Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Mike Terranova (from 2024-02-06) (until 2024-06-30) | 1976-11-17 | ||||
Jorn Nowak (until 2024-02-05) | 1986-04-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Davari | 1988-01-06 | |||
22 | Kevin Kratzsch | 2002-07-09 | |||
36 | Robin Benz | 1995-11-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Baran Seker (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-01-02 | ||||
2 | Moritz Montag (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-03-27 | |||
3 | Pierre Fassnacht | 1996-01-26 | |||
4 | Tim Stappmann (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-07-17 | |||
13 | Kerem Yalcin | 2004-12-02 | |||
14 | Nico Klass | 1997-04-03 | |||
19 | Dominik Burghard | 2004-03-09 | |||
25 | Tanju Ozturk | 1989-07-26 | |||
27 | Cottrell Ezekwem | 1999-05-13 | |||
28 | Tobias Boche (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-08-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ozan Hot (from 2023-11-04) (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-05-09 | ||||
Timo Böhm (from 2024-03-21) (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-14 | ||||
5 | Christian Marz (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-07-05 | |||
6 | Fabian Holthaus (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-01-17 | |||
8 | Matona-Glody Ngyombo | 1998-02-14 | |||
10 | Moritz Stoppelkamp | 1986-12-11 | |||
15 | Edin Hadzibajramovic (from 2023-11-01) | 2005-07-29 | |||
17 | Phil Thierri Sieben (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-06-20 | |||
20 | Rinor Rexha (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-05-19 | |||
29 | Michel Niemeyer | 1995-11-19 | |||
38 | Oguzhan Kefkir (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-08-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Marius Kleinsorge (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-10-30 | |||
9 | Sebastian Mai (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-11-08 | |||
11 | Sven Kreyer (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-05-14 | |||
17 | Manfredas Ruzgis (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-01-05 | |||
18 | Denis Donkor | 2003-12-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2023-07-19 18:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |