Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Petrik Sander (until 2018-02-11) | 1960-11-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Sebastian Patzler (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-10-24 | |||
30 | Kadir Yalcin (from 2016-01-07) (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-04-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Marvin Weber (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-02-08 | ||||
8 | Michael Stahl (from 2016-01-28) (until 2024-06-30) | 1987-09-15 | |||
13 | Marcel Stieffenhofer (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-03-05 | |||
16 | Andre Marx (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-01-21 | |||
20 | Robert Stark (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-11-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Eldin Hadzic (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-11-02 | ||||
4 | Daniel von der Bracke (from 2015-07-29) (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-01-28 | |||
4 | Daniel von der Bracke (from 2015-07-29) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-01-28 | |||
4 | Daniel von der Bracke (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-01-28 | |||
7 | Eldin Hadzic (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-11-02 | |||
8 | Michael Stahl (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-09-15 | |||
19 | Akiyoshi Saito (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-02-19 | |||
23 | Tony Schmidt (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-07-20 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Giorgi Piranaschwili (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-09-21 | ||||
Ivan Mamic (from 2015-07-20) (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-09-15 | ||||
14 | Fabian Montabell (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-02-13 | |||
20 | Danko Boskovic (until 2016-06-30) | 1982-01-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2015-07-04 15:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |