Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Steffen Baumgart (from 2017-04-16) (until 2021-06-30) | 1972-01-05 | ||||
Stefan Emmerling (from 2016-12-06) (until 2017-04-16) | 1966-02-10 | ||||
Rene Muller (until 2016-11-20) | 1974-05-19 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Florian Fulland (from 2016-11-21) (until 2016-12-31) | 1984-09-15 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Florian Fulland (from 2016-10-25) (until 2016-11-20) | 1984-09-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lukas Kruse (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-07-09 | |||
30 | Till Brinkmann (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-11-01 | |||
34 | Michael Ratajczak (from 2017-01-19) (until 2017-06-30) | 1982-04-16 | |||
35 | Jonas Brammen (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-07-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Lukas Boeder (from 2017-01-23) (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-04-18 | |||
3 | Florian Ruck (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-02-06 | |||
4 | Tim Sebastian (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-01-17 | |||
5 | Christian Strohdiek (until 2021-01-06) | 1988-01-22 | |||
12 | Felix Herzenbruch (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-08-08 | |||
13 | Sebastian Schonlau (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-08-05 | |||
14 | Thomas Bertels (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-11-05 | |||
20 | Pascal Itter (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-04-03 | |||
29 | Sebastian Heidinger (from 2017-01-10) (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-01-11 | |||
32 | Jan-Steven Erisa (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-09-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Niko Dobros (until 2017-01-26) | 1993-05-24 | |||
8 | Marc-Andre Kruska (until 2018-01-31) | 1987-06-29 | |||
10 | Dino Medjedovic (until 2017-01-16) | 1989-06-13 | |||
11 | Christian Bickel (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-01-27 | |||
16 | Dardan Karimani (from 2017-02-01) (until 2019-01-18) | 1998-11-23 | |||
19 | Marc Vucinovic (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-09-19 | |||
21 | Semir Saric (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-09-08 | |||
23 | Robin Krausse (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-04-02 | |||
25 | Aykut Soyak (until 2018-01-26) | 1995-04-30 | |||
27 | Marcus Piossek (from 2016-08-31) (until 2017-08-13) | 1989-07-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Sergio Baris Gucciardo (from 2017-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-04-19 | ||||
9 | Koen van der Biezen (until 2018-01-21) | 1985-07-10 | |||
17 | Zlatko Dedic (from 2016-08-31) (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-10-05 | |||
18 | Tim Mannek (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-05-21 | |||
22 | Sven Michel (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-07-15 | |||
31 | Ben Zolinski (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-05-03 | |||
33 | Roope Riski (from 2017-01-10) (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-08-16 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Niko Dobros (from 2017-01-27) (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-05-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 2017-01-17 18:30 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |