Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heiko Herrlich (until 2018-12-23) | 1971-12-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Bernd Leno (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-03-04 | |||
28 | Ramazan Ozcan (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-06-28 | |||
36 | Niklas Lomb (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-07-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Andre Ramalho (until 2017-12-31) | 1992-02-16 | |||
3 | Panagiotis Retsos (from 2017-08-31) (until 2020-01-31) | 1998-08-09 | |||
4 | Jonathan Tah | 1996-02-11 | |||
5 | Sven Bender (from 2017-07-13) (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
6 | Aleksandar Dragovic (until 2017-08-30) | 1991-03-06 | |||
16 | Tin Jedvaj (until 2019-08-20) | 1995-11-28 | |||
18 | Wendell (until 2021-08-20) | 1993-07-20 | |||
34 | Joel Abu Hanna (until 2017-08-29) | 1998-01-22 | |||
39 | Benjamin Henrichs (until 2018-08-28) | 1997-02-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Lars Bender (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
10 | Julian Brandt (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-05-02 | |||
10 | Hakan Calhanoglu (until 2017-07-03) | 1994-02-08 | |||
15 | Julian Baumgartlinger (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-01-02 | |||
20 | Charles Aranguiz (until 2023-04-03) | 1989-04-17 | |||
21 | Dominik Kohr (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-01-31 | |||
22 | Wladlen Jurtschenko (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-01-22 | |||
29 | Kai Havertz (until 2020-09-03) | 1999-06-11 | |||
30 | Sam Francis Schreck (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-01-29 | |||
33 | Atakan Akkaynak (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-01-05 | |||
37 | Marlon Frey (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-03-24 | |||
38 | Karim Bellarabi (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-04-08 | |||
44 | Kevin Kampl (until 2017-08-31) | 1990-10-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Chicharito (until 2017-07-23) | 1988-06-01 | |||
9 | Leon Bailey (until 2021-08-03) | 1997-08-09 | |||
11 | Stefan Kiessling (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-01-25 | |||
13 | Lucas Alario (from 2017-08-31) (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-10-08 | |||
14 | Admir Mehmedi (until 2018-01-30) | 1991-03-16 | |||
17 | Joel Pohjanpalo (until 2020-01-24) | 1994-09-13 | |||
31 | Kevin Volland (until 2020-09-01) | 1992-07-30 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Aleksandar Dragovic (from 2017-08-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-03-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2017-07-08 14:30 |
- : - Cm |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2017-07-08 14:30 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2017-07-14 17:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2017-07-19 18:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2017-07-23 14:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2017-07-27 18:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2017-07-30 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2017-08-05 14:00 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2017-08-31 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2017-10-05 15:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2017-11-09 15:00 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2018-01-05 14:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-01-06 14:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-01-13 11:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2018-01-23 11:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2018-03-22 15:00 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |