Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Daniel Zillken (until 2018-11-11) | 1967-08-03 | ||||
Michael Braun (until 2018-06-30) | 1958-06-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Martin Michel (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-08-05 | |||
30 | Alexander Monath (from 2017-07-14) (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-08-30 | |||
50 | Andy Hubert (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-12-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Adis Omerbasic (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-02-02 | |||
4 | Mario Weber (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-05-04 | |||
6 | Sebastian Spinrath (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-06-26 | |||
14 | Ricardo Retterath (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-07-20 | |||
16 | Dennis Engelman (from 2018-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-02-08 | |||
16 | Ugur Dundar (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-11-01 | |||
18 | Nico Perrey (until 2020-10-04) | 1994-02-02 | |||
22 | Gunter Mabanza (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-01-23 | |||
23 | Sebastian Hirsch (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-02-27 | |||
24 | Joran Sobiech (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-11-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
10 | Vojno Jesic (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-03-04 | |||
15 | Kris Fillinger (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-03-22 | |||
19 | Jannik Stoffels (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-02-22 | |||
20 | Dario Schumacher (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-04-01 | |||
20 | Abdelkader Maouel (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-05-22 | |||
21 | Gordon Addai (until 2018-11-11) | 1982-01-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | David Bors (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-04-13 | |||
8 | Lars Lokotsch (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-05-17 | |||
9 | Marcel Kaiser (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-06-06 | |||
13 | Aleksandar Pranjes (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-11-13 | |||
17 | Daniel Somuah (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-07-30 | |||
24 | Marco Ban (from 2017-08-10) (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-08-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2017-07-19 18:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |