Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Koschinat (until 2018-10-14) | 1971-09-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Tim Boss (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-06-28 | |||
21 | Jannik Bruhns (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-05-11 | |||
33 | Andre Poggenborg (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-09-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Aaron Eichhorn (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-09-22 | ||||
2 | Dominik Ernst (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-08-08 | |||
3 | Bernard Kyere (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-07-01 | |||
4 | Bone Uaferro (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-01-04 | |||
14 | Cimo Rocker (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-01-21 | |||
17 | Alem Koljic (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-02-16 | |||
22 | Christoph Menz (from 2018-01-08) (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-12-22 | |||
27 | Cedric Mimbala (until 2018-01-30) | 1986-08-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Markus Pazurek (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-12-18 | |||
6 | Okan Kurt (from 2017-07-28) (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-01-11 | |||
7 | Michael Kessel (until 2019-06-30) | 1984-08-28 | |||
10 | Maik Kegel (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-12-08 | |||
15 | Christopher Theisen (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-06-13 | |||
20 | Robin Scheu (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-02-16 | |||
23 | Moritz Fritz (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-07-15 | |||
28 | Lars Bender (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-01-08 | |||
29 | Ali Ceylan (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-06-17 | |||
30 | Hamdi Dahmani (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-11-16 | |||
31 | Nico Brandenburger (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-01-17 | |||
34 | Kristoffer Andersen (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-12-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Daniel Keita-Ruel (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-09-21 | |||
11 | Amir Falahen (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-03-15 | |||
18 | Thomas Broker (from 2018-01-12) (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-01-22 | |||
27 | Maurice Exslager (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-02-12 | |||
37 | Manuel Farrona-Pulido (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-05-01 | |||
38 | Kai Burger (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-11-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2017-10-05 15:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |