Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Andreas Kronenberg (until 2022-06-30) | 1974-09-10 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Christian Streich (until 2024-06-30) | 1965-06-11 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Lars Vossler (until 2024-06-30) | 1976-03-09 | ||||
Florian Bruns (until 2020-06-30) | 1979-08-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Alexander Schwolow (until 2020-07-04) | 1992-06-02 | |||
21 | Patric Klandt (until 2018-06-30) | 1983-09-29 | |||
44 | Rafal Gikiewicz (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-10-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Aleksandar Ignjovski (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-01-27 | |||
3 | Philipp Lienhart (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-07-11 | |||
4 | Caglar Soyuncu (until 2018-08-09) | 1996-05-23 | |||
5 | Manuel Gulde | 1991-02-12 | |||
5 | Manuel Gulde (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-02-12 | |||
14 | Patrick Kammerbauer (from 2018-01-30) (until 2019-01-28) | 1997-02-11 | |||
15 | Pascal Stenzel (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-03-20 | |||
17 | Lukas Kubler | 1992-08-30 | |||
20 | Marc-Oliver Kempf (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-01-28 | |||
24 | Georg Niedermeier (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-02-26 | |||
25 | Robin Koch (from 2017-08-22) (until 2020-08-29) | 1996-07-17 | |||
26 | Gaetan Bussmann (from 2018-01-29) (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-02-02 | |||
30 | Christian Gunter | 1993-02-28 | |||
30 | Christian Gunter (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-02-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Amir Abrashi (until 2021-01-26) | 1990-03-27 | |||
8 | Mike Frantz (until 2020-07-22) | 1986-10-14 | |||
11 | Onur Bulut (until 2018-01-25) | 1994-04-16 | |||
14 | Ryan Kent (until 2018-01-08) | 1996-11-11 | |||
16 | Yoric Ravet (from 2017-08-26) (until 2019-02-06) | 1989-09-12 | |||
19 | Janik Haberer (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-04-02 | |||
22 | Vincent Sierro (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-10-08 | |||
23 | Julian Schuster (until 2018-06-30) | 1985-04-15 | |||
27 | Nicolas Hofler | 1990-03-09 | |||
27 | Nicolas Hofler (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-03-09 | |||
28 | Jonas Meffert (until 2018-07-29) | 1994-09-04 | |||
31 | Karim Guede (until 2018-06-30) | 1985-01-07 | |||
32 | Bartosz Kapustka (from 2017-07-14) (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-12-23 | |||
33 | Caleb Stanko (until 2019-01-23) | 1993-07-26 | |||
38 | Florian Kath (until 2020-10-05) | 1994-10-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Fabian Schleusener (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-10-24 | ||||
7 | Florian Niederlechner (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-10-24 | |||
9 | Lucas Holer (from 2017-12-30) | 1994-07-10 | |||
9 | Lucas Holer (from 2017-12-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-07-10 | |||
13 | Marco Terrazzino (from 2017-08-11) (until 2020-01-03) | 1991-04-15 | |||
14 | Havard Nielsen (until 2017-07-14) | 1993-07-15 | |||
18 | Nils Petersen (until 2023-06-30) | 1988-12-06 | |||
34 | Tim Kleindienst (until 2019-09-02) | 1995-08-31 | |||
40 | Mohamed Drager (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-06-24 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Fabian Schleusener (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-10-24 | ||||
Mats Moller Daehli (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-03-02 | ||||
Lucas Hufnagel (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-01-29 | ||||
Jonas Fohrenbach (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-01-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2017-07-06 18:00 |
0 : 8 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2017-07-09 17:00 |
0 : 8 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2017-07-11 18:00 |
0 : 11 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2017-07-14 18:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2017-07-19 18:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2017-07-20 17:30 |
- : - n.p. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2017-07-22 17:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2017-08-06 17:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2017-08-31 18:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2017-10-05 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2018-01-07 13:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2018-01-07 17:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |