Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Interimstrainer | |||||
Anel Dzaka (from 2018-02-11) (until 2018-06-30) | 1980-09-19 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Petrik Sander (until 2018-02-11) | 1960-11-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Chris Keilmann (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-04-02 | |||
25 | Jannik Reinlander (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-09-18 | |||
30 | Levent Vanli (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-02-03 | |||
33 | Dieter Paucken (from 2018-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1982-09-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jeremy Lundy (from 2018-02-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-05-05 | ||||
5 | Michael Schuler (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-07-22 | |||
8 | Michael Stahl (until 2024-06-30) | 1987-09-15 | |||
15 | Marco Muller (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-04-07 | |||
16 | Andre Marx (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-01-21 | |||
20 | Ioannis Nalbantis (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-04-19 | |||
22 | Ricardo Antonaci (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-03-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Eldin Hadzic (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-11-02 | ||||
Patrik Dzalto (from 2018-02-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-02-19 | ||||
Felix Konighaus (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-04-29 | ||||
4 | Daniel von der Bracke (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-01-28 | |||
4 | Daniel von der Bracke (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-01-28 | |||
4 | Daniel von der Bracke (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-01-28 | |||
6 | Dino Bajric (from 2017-07-14) (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-07-12 | |||
8 | Michael Stahl (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-09-15 | |||
10 | Andreas Glockner (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-02-25 | |||
11 | Kevin Lahn (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-02-14 | |||
14 | Nicolai Lorenzoni (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-05-01 | |||
17 | Emre Kaya (from 2018-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-05-31 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Felix Kafferbitz (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-08-12 | |||
9 | Erik Wekesser (until 2018-01-11) | 1997-07-03 | |||
13 | Jan Engels (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-02-21 | |||
17 | Jordi Arndt (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-04-22 | |||
18 | Dimitrios Popovits (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-02-11 | |||
19 | Dejan Bozic (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-01-22 | |||
21 | Marco Koch (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-10-27 | |||
24 | Lukas Hombach (from 2017-10-11) (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-06-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 2017-07-11 18:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |