Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Boris Schommers (from 2019-02-13) (until 2019-06-30) | 1979-01-19 | ||||
Michael Kollner (until 2019-02-12) | 1969-12-29 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Marek Mintal (from 2019-02-13) (until 2019-06-30) | 1977-09-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Fabian Bredlow (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-03-02 | |||
26 | Christian Mathenia | 1992-03-31 | |||
30 | Patric Klandt (from 2018-07-27) (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-09-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Ekin Celebi (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-06-06 | ||||
2 | Kevin Goden (until 2019-09-02) | 1999-02-22 | |||
4 | Ewerton (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-03-23 | |||
8 | Robert Bauer (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-04-09 | |||
20 | Lukas Jager (until 2020-01-28) | 1994-02-12 | |||
22 | Enrico Valentini | 1989-02-20 | |||
23 | Tim Leibold (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-11-30 | |||
28 | Lukas Muhl (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-01-27 | |||
33 | Georg Margreitter (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-11-07 | |||
34 | Dennis Lippert (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-02-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ivo Ilicevic (from 2019-01-30) (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-11-14 | ||||
10 | Sebastian Kerk (until 2020-07-12) | 1994-04-17 | |||
14 | Yuya Kubo (from 2018-08-19) (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-12-24 | |||
17 | Eduard Lowen (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-01-28 | |||
18 | Hanno Behrens (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-03-26 | |||
29 | Patrick Erras (until 2020-07-12) | 1995-01-21 | |||
31 | Ondrej Petrak (until 2020-01-26) | 1992-03-11 | |||
35 | Alexander Fuchs (until 2020-01-24) | 1997-01-01 | |||
37 | Timothy Tillman (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-01-04 | |||
38 | Simon Rhein (until 2019-09-02) | 1998-05-18 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Matheus Pereira (from 2018-08-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-05-05 | ||||
7 | Edgar Salli (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-08-17 | |||
9 | Mikael Ishak (until 2020-07-12) | 1993-03-31 | |||
11 | Adam Zrelak (until 2021-02-11) | 1994-05-05 | |||
19 | Torles Knoll (until 2019-08-22) | 1997-09-13 | |||
21 | Federico Palacios Martinez (until 2019-09-02) | 1995-04-09 | |||
24 | Virgil Misidjan (from 2018-08-31) (until 2021-01-08) | 1993-07-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2018-07-08 17:00 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2018-07-12 19:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-07-14 17:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2018-07-18 19:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-07-21 17:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2018-07-31 17:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-08-04 17:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-08-11 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-10-13 16:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-11-17 15:30 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2019-01-07 15:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2019-01-11 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2019-03-22 14:30 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |