Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sandro Schwarz (until 2019-11-10) | 1978-10-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Rene Adler (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-01-15 | |||
22 | Florian Muller (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-11-13 | |||
27 | Robin Zentner | 1994-10-28 | |||
27 | Robin Zentner (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-10-28 | |||
33 | Jannik Huth (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-04-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Ahmet Gurleyen (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-04-26 | ||||
2 | Giulio Donati (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-02-05 | |||
3 | Aaron Caricol (from 2018-08-06) (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-04-22 | |||
16 | Stefan Bell | 1991-08-24 | |||
16 | Stefan Bell (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-08-24 | |||
18 | Daniel Brosinski (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-07-17 | |||
19 | Moussa Niakhaté (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-03-08 | |||
23 | Phillipp Mwene (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-01-29 | |||
24 | Gaetan Bussmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-02-02 | |||
26 | Niko Bungert (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-10-24 | |||
42 | Alexander Hack (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-09-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Jean-Paul Boetius (from 2018-08-27) (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-03-22 | |||
5 | Jose Rodriguez (until 2018-08-28) | 1994-12-16 | |||
6 | Danny Latza (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-12-07 | |||
8 | Levin Oztunali (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-03-15 | |||
10 | Alexandru Maxim (until 2020-01-28) | 1990-07-08 | |||
14 | Pierre Kunde (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-07-26 | |||
25 | Jean-Philippe Gbamin (until 2019-08-02) | 1995-09-25 | |||
30 | Besar Halimi (until 2018-08-30) | 1994-12-12 | |||
32 | Pablo de Blasis (until 2018-08-30) | 1988-02-04 | |||
34 | Bote Baku (until 2020-10-01) | 1998-04-08 | |||
35 | Leandro Barreiro Martins (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-01-03 | |||
38 | Gerrit Holtmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-03-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Issah Abass (from 2018-08-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-09-26 | ||||
7 | Robin Quaison (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-10-09 | |||
9 | Jean-Philippe Mateta (until 2021-01-20) | 1997-06-28 | |||
9 | Yoshinori Muto (until 2018-08-02) | 1992-07-15 | |||
11 | Emil Berggreen (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-05-10 | |||
20 | Anthony Ujah (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-10-14 | |||
21 | Karim Onisiwo (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-03-17 | |||
29 | Jonathan Burkardt | 2000-07-11 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Marin Sverko (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-02-04 | ||||
Jose Rodriguez (from 2018-08-28) (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-12-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2018-07-04 18:30 |
0 : 10 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-07-07 19:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2018-07-12 18:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2018-07-13 18:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2018-07-27 18:30 |
5 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2018-07-31 18:30 |
6 : 7 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2018-10-12 18:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2018-11-15 18:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2019-01-05 15:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2019-01-08 16:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2019-01-12 11:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2019-01-12 14:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |