Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Bosz (from 2018-12-23) (until 2021-03-22) | 1963-11-21 | ||||
Heiko Herrlich (until 2018-12-23) | 1971-12-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lukas Hradecky | 1989-11-24 | |||
24 | Thorsten Kirschbaum (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-04-20 | |||
28 | Ramazan Ozcan (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-06-28 | |||
40 | Tomasz Kucz (until 2019-01-23) | 1999-07-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Panagiotis Retsos (until 2020-01-31) | 1998-08-09 | |||
4 | Jonathan Tah | 1996-02-11 | |||
5 | Sven Bender (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
6 | Aleksandar Dragovic (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-03-06 | |||
16 | Tin Jedvaj (until 2019-08-20) | 1995-11-28 | |||
18 | Wendell (until 2021-08-20) | 1993-07-20 | |||
23 | Mitchell Weiser (until 2021-08-31) | 1994-04-21 | |||
33 | Jan Boller (from 2019-02-12) (until 2019-07-31) | 2000-03-14 | |||
39 | Benjamin Henrichs (until 2018-08-28) | 1997-02-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Lars Bender (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
10 | Julian Brandt (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-05-02 | |||
15 | Julian Baumgartlinger (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-01-02 | |||
20 | Charles Aranguiz (until 2023-04-03) | 1989-04-17 | |||
21 | Dominik Kohr (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-01-31 | |||
29 | Kai Havertz (until 2020-09-03) | 1999-06-11 | |||
30 | Sam Francis Schreck (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-01-29 | |||
36 | Adrian Stanilewicz (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-02-22 | |||
37 | Herdi Bukusu (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-04-03 | |||
38 | Karim Bellarabi (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-04-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Paulinho (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-07-15 | |||
9 | Leon Bailey (until 2021-08-03) | 1997-08-09 | |||
11 | Isaac Thelin (from 2018-08-07) (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-06-24 | |||
13 | Lucas Alario (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-10-08 | |||
17 | Joel Pohjanpalo (until 2020-01-24) | 1994-09-13 | |||
31 | Kevin Volland (until 2020-09-01) | 1992-07-30 | |||
32 | Jakub Bednarczyk (until 2019-01-22) | 1999-01-02 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Niklas Lomb (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-07-28 | ||||
Tomasz Kucz (from 2019-01-23) (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-07-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2018-07-18 18:00 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-07-21 15:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2018-07-24 19:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-07-28 18:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2018-08-02 17:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-08-11 21:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2019-01-08 14:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2019-01-11 14:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2019-01-11 16:15 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |