Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Claus Schromm (until 2020-07-28) | 1969-04-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lukas Konigshofer (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-03-16 | |||
22 | Nico Mantl (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-02-06 | |||
34 | Michael Gurski (until 2019-06-30) | 1979-03-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Maximilian Bauer (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-02-23 | |||
3 | Thomas Hagn (until 2020-01-09) | 1995-02-28 | |||
4 | Alexander Winkler (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-01-26 | |||
5 | Josef Welzmuller (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-01-10 | |||
6 | Marc Endres (until 2021-02-01) | 1991-02-22 | |||
8 | Max Dombrowka (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-03-24 | |||
15 | Christoph Greger (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-01-14 | |||
23 | Markus Schwabl | 1990-08-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Finn Porath (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-02-23 | |||
10 | Lucas Hufnagel (from 2018-07-02) (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-01-29 | |||
13 | Jim-Patrick Muller (until 2021-01-25) | 1989-08-04 | |||
18 | Niclas Anspach (from 2019-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-07-22 | |||
19 | Maximilian Krauss (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-11-24 | |||
20 | Dominik Stahl (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-08-20 | |||
21 | Sascha Bigalke (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-01-08 | |||
23 | Anes Osmanoski (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-06-14 | |||
30 | Luca Marseiler (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-02-18 | |||
31 | Orestis Kiomourtzoglou (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-05-07 | |||
35 | Hyunseok Hong (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-06-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Stephan Hain (until 2023-06-30) | 1988-09-27 | |||
11 | Stefan Schimmer (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-04-28 | |||
17 | Dominik Widemann (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-07-30 | |||
24 | Alexander Kaltner (until 2020-07-05) | 1999-10-24 | |||
33 | Christoph Ehlich (until 2020-01-01) | 1999-02-02 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Florian Wiedl (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-10-28 | ||||
Pascal Schoch (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-03-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2018-07-13 17:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |