Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Koschinat (from 2018-10-15) (until 2020-11-24) | 1971-09-01 | ||||
Kenan Kocak (until 2018-10-08) | 1981-01-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
13 | Rick Wulle (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-06-04 | |||
16 | Marcel Schuhen (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-01-13 | |||
29 | Niklas Lomb (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-07-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Alexander Schirow (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-01-24 | |||
3 | Alexander Rossipal (until 2019-08-26) | 1996-06-06 | |||
4 | Jesper Verlaat (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-06-04 | |||
5 | Marcel Seegert (until 2019-01-03) | 1994-04-29 | |||
14 | Tim Kister (until 2022-06-30) | 1986-12-30 | |||
18 | Dennis Diekmeier (from 2019-01-03) (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-10-20 | |||
19 | Leart Pacarada (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-10-08 | |||
23 | Markus Karl (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-02-14 | |||
24 | Philipp Klingmann (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-04-22 | |||
30 | Soren Dieckmann (from 2019-01-08) (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-01-16 | |||
34 | Tim Knipping (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-11-24 | |||
36 | Ken Gipson (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-02-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Denis Linsmayer (until 2021-07-29) | 1991-09-19 | |||
8 | Nejmeddin Daghfous (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-10-01 | |||
8 | Mohamed Gouaida (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-05-15 | |||
17 | Erik Zenga (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-01-18 | |||
20 | Emanuel Taffertshofer (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-02-24 | |||
21 | Karim Guede (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-01-07 | |||
22 | Korbinian Vollmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-10-27 | |||
25 | Felix Muller (until 2020-01-24) | 1993-01-27 | |||
27 | Maximilian Jansen (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-05-26 | |||
28 | Philipp Forster (until 2019-09-02) | 1995-02-04 | |||
31 | Stefan Kulovits (until 2020-06-30) | 1983-04-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Andrew Wooten (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-09-30 | |||
9 | Rurik Gislason (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-02-25 | |||
11 | Fabian Schleusener (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-10-24 | |||
12 | Florian Hansch (until 2019-01-10) | 1995-08-22 | |||
16 | Kevin Behrens (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-02-03 | |||
18 | Robert Herrmann (until 2018-07-09) | 1993-08-10 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Florian Hansch (from 2019-01-10) (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-08-22 | ||||
Mirco Born (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-06-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2018-07-25 18:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |