Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Julian Nagelsmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-07-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Matthias Kaltenbach (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-03-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Baumann | 1990-06-02 | |||
33 | Alexander Stolz (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-10-13 | |||
36 | Gregor Kobel (until 2019-01-03) | 1997-12-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Joshua Brenet (until 2020-01-31) | 1994-03-20 | |||
3 | Pavel Kaderabek | 1992-04-25 | |||
3 | Pavel Kaderabek (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-04-25 | |||
4 | Ermin Bicakcic (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-01-24 | |||
6 | Havard Nordtveit (until 2019-01-31) | 1990-06-21 | |||
15 | Kasim Nuhu (from 2018-07-25) (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-06-22 | |||
15 | Kasim Nuhu (from 2018-07-25) (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-06-22 | |||
16 | Nico Schulz (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-04-01 | |||
21 | Benjamin Hubner (until 2022-12-06) | 1989-07-04 | |||
22 | Kevin Vogt (until 2024-01-11) | 1991-09-23 | |||
22 | Kevin Vogt (until 2020-01-12) | 1991-09-23 | |||
24 | Justin Hoogma (until 2019-07-29) | 1998-06-11 | |||
25 | Kevin Akpoguma (until 2018-12-31) | 1995-04-19 | |||
31 | Lucas Ribeiro (from 2019-01-28) (until 2020-09-18) | 1999-01-19 | |||
32 | Melayro Bogarde (from 2018-07-09) (until 2022-01-14) | 2002-05-28 | |||
38 | Stefan Posch (until 2022-08-31) | 1997-05-14 | |||
41 | Alfons Amade (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-11-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Lukas Rupp (until 2020-01-13) | 1991-01-08 | |||
8 | Dennis Geiger | 1998-06-10 | |||
8 | Dennis Geiger (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-06-10 | |||
10 | Kerem Demirbay (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-07-03 | |||
11 | Florian Grillitsch (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-08-07 | |||
13 | Leonardo Bittencourt (until 2019-09-02) | 1993-12-19 | |||
17 | Steven Zuber (until 2019-01-17) | 1991-08-17 | |||
18 | Nadiem Amiri (until 2019-07-30) | 1996-10-27 | |||
20 | Robert Zulj (until 2018-08-22) | 1992-02-05 | |||
30 | Philipp Ochs (until 2018-08-09) | 1997-04-17 | |||
37 | Robin Hack (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-08-27 | |||
42 | Christoph Baumgartner (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-08-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Reiss Nelson (from 2018-08-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-12-10 | ||||
19 | Ishak Belfodil (until 2021-08-22) | 1992-01-12 | |||
23 | Felipe Pires (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-04-18 | |||
26 | David Otto (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-03-03 | |||
27 | Andrej Kramaric | 1991-06-19 | |||
28 | Adam Szalai (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-12-09 | |||
32 | Vincenzo Grifo (until 2019-01-06) | 1993-04-07 | |||
34 | Joelinton (until 2019-07-22) | 1996-08-14 | |||
35 | Meris Skenderovic (until 2019-01-29) | 1998-03-28 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Gregor Kobel (from 2019-01-03) (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-12-06 | ||||
Bruno Nazario (until 2019-12-31) | 1995-02-09 | ||||
Antonio-Mirko Colak (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-09-17 | ||||
Philipp Ochs (from 2018-08-09) (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-04-17 | ||||
Kevin Akpoguma (from 2019-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-04-19 | ||||
Vincenzo Grifo (from 2019-01-06) (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-04-07 | ||||
Steven Zuber (from 2019-01-17) (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-08-17 | ||||
Meris Skenderovic (from 2019-01-29) (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-03-28 | ||||
6 | Havard Nordtveit (from 2019-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-06-21 | |||
20 | Robert Zulj (from 2018-08-22) (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-02-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2018-07-13 17:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-07-21 17:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-08-04 16:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-08-11 15:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2019-01-11 12:00 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2019-01-11 15:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |