Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bruno Labbadia (until 2019-06-30) | 1966-02-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Koen Casteels (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-06-25 | |||
12 | Pavao Pervan | 1987-11-13 | |||
36 | Phillip Menzel (until 2020-07-12) | 1998-08-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | William (until 2021-01-24) | 1995-04-03 | |||
3 | Paul Verhaegh (until 2019-04-30) | 1983-09-01 | |||
5 | Jeffrey Bruma (until 2019-01-31) | 1991-11-13 | |||
15 | Jérôme Roussillon (from 2018-08-06) (until 2023-01-13) | 1993-01-06 | |||
17 | Ohis Felix Uduokhai (until 2019-07-27) | 1997-09-09 | |||
24 | Sebastian Jung (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-06-22 | |||
25 | John Anthony Brooks (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-01-28 | |||
31 | Robin Knoche (until 2020-08-04) | 1992-05-22 | |||
32 | Marcel Tisserand (until 2020-09-15) | 1993-01-10 | |||
35 | Gian-Luca Itter (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-01-05 | |||
39 | Paul Jaeckel (until 2018-08-30) | 1998-07-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Iba May (until 2020-07-31) | 1998-06-06 | ||||
4 | Camacho (until 2020-09-15) | 1990-05-04 | |||
6 | Riechedly Bazoer (until 2018-08-31) | 1996-10-12 | |||
7 | Josip Brekalo (until 2023-01-28) | 1998-06-23 | |||
8 | Renato Steffen (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-11-03 | |||
10 | Yunus Malli (until 2020-01-17) | 1992-02-24 | |||
11 | Felix Klaus (until 2021-01-14) | 1992-09-13 | |||
13 | Yannick Gerhardt (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-03-13 | |||
14 | Admir Mehmedi (until 2022-01-14) | 1991-03-16 | |||
16 | Jakub Blaszczykowski (until 2019-01-03) | 1985-12-14 | |||
21 | Paul-Georges Ntep (until 2020-02-11) | 1992-07-29 | |||
23 | Josuha Guilavogui (until 2022-01-29) | 1990-09-19 | |||
27 | Maximilian Arnold | 1994-05-27 | |||
30 | Paul Seguin (until 2019-01-17) | 1995-03-29 | |||
34 | Marvin Stefaniak (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-02-03 | |||
37 | Elvis Rexhbecaj (until 2020-01-06) | 1997-11-01 | |||
38 | Ismail Azzaoui (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-01-06 | |||
39 | John Yeboah (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-06-23 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Wout Weghorst (until 2022-01-30) | 1992-08-07 | |||
18 | Victor Osimhen (until 2018-08-22) | 1998-12-29 | |||
20 | Luca Horn (until 2020-09-30) | 1998-12-19 | |||
29 | Omar Marmoush (until 2021-01-05) | 1999-02-07 | |||
29 | Kaylen Hinds (until 2018-09-06) | 1998-01-28 | |||
33 | Daniel Ginczek (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-04-13 | |||
43 | Julian Justvan (until 2020-09-15) | 1998-04-02 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Nany Landry Dimata (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-09-01 | ||||
Victor Osimhen (from 2018-08-22) (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-12-29 | ||||
Riechedly Bazoer (from 2018-08-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-10-12 | ||||
Paul Seguin (from 2019-01-17) (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-03-29 | ||||
Jeffrey Bruma (from 2019-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-11-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 2018-07-10 17:30 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2018-07-13 18:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2018-07-19 18:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-07-28 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2018-08-03 18:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-08-11 19:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2018-09-07 16:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2018-10-11 15:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2018-11-15 14:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2019-01-06 16:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2019-01-12 14:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2019-05-24 14:00 |
2 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |