Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Alexander Zorniger | 1967-10-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Semir Kaymakci | 2004-11-01 | ||||
1 | Nils Korber | 1996-11-13 | |||
42 | Moritz Schulze | 2001-03-22 | |||
44 | Nahuel Noll | 2003-03-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Damian Michalski | 1998-05-17 | ||||
Oualid Mhamdi | 2003-05-20 | ||||
Matti Wagner | 2005-06-07 | ||||
Reno Münz | 2005-10-02 | ||||
2 | Simon Asta | 2001-01-25 | |||
17 | Niko Giesselmann | 1991-09-26 | |||
18 | Marco Meyerhofer | 1995-11-18 | |||
27 | Gian-Luca Itter | 1999-01-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jomaine Ellay Consbruch | 2002-01-26 | ||||
Leander Popp | 2005-05-26 | ||||
Philipp Müller | 2004-01-18 | ||||
Roberto Massimo | 2000-10-12 | ||||
Sacha Bansé (from 2024-08-25) | 2001-03-16 | ||||
21 | Kerim Calhanoglu | 2002-08-26 | |||
23 | Gideon Jung | 1994-09-12 | |||
33 | Maximilian Dietz | 2002-02-09 | |||
34 | Denis Pfaffenrot | 2005-03-18 | |||
37 | Julian Green | 1995-06-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Noel Futkeu | 2002-12-06 | ||||
Nemanja Motika | 2003-03-20 | ||||
7 | Dennis Srbeny | 1994-05-05 | |||
8 | Suliman Marlon Mustapha | 2001-05-24 | |||
10 | Branimir Hrgota | 1993-01-12 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Lasse Schulz (until 2024-08-21) | 2003-03-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2024-07-19 18:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2024-07-26 14:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |