Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans Tilkowski (until 1976-06-30) | 1935-07-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gerhard Hummel (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-08-22 | ||||
Klaus Muller (until 1977-06-30) | 1956-12-23 | ||||
Paul Hesselbach (until 1976-06-30) | 1951-07-06 | ||||
Jurgen Bucher (until 1976-06-30) | 1957-03-22 | ||||
Franz Schwarzwalder (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-12-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Horst Weyerich (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-08-13 | ||||
Norbert Eder (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-11-07 | ||||
Peter Stocker (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-06-30 | ||||
Manfred Rusing (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-06-03 | ||||
Rudolf Sturz (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-11-18 | ||||
Kurt Geinzer (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-07-03 | ||||
Rudolf Hannakampf (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-10-22 | ||||
Ulrich Pechtold (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-07-24 | ||||
Gunter Dampfling (until 1976-06-30) | 1956-01-11 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dieter Lieberwirth (until 1988-12-31) | 1954-01-13 | ||||
Reinhold Scholl (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-10-23 | ||||
Slobodan Petrovic (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-10-02 | ||||
Dieter Nussing (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-08-15 | ||||
Jan Majkowski (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-10-20 | ||||
Branislav Krstic (until 1976-12-31) | 1950-02-21 | ||||
Walter Lachmann (until 1976-09-30) | 1951-08-27 | ||||
Wolfgang Holoch (until 1975-08-31) | 1947-12-22 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hans Walitza (until 1979-06-30) | 1945-11-26 | ||||
Karlheinz Meininger (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-02-01 | ||||
Hans-Gunter von de Fenn (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-03-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1976-06-17 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1976-06-23 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |