Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Otto Rehhagel (from 1976-06-16) (until 1978-04-30) | 1938-08-09 | ||||
Horst Buhtz (from 1976-01-31) (until 1976-06-15) | 1923-09-21 | ||||
Otto Knefler (until 1976-01-29) | 1923-09-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Horst Bertram (until 1983-06-30) | 1948-11-16 | ||||
Willi Brock (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-04-08 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Lothar Huber (until 1987-06-30) | 1952-05-05 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Wagner (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-01-31 | ||||
Friedhelm Schwarze (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-12-30 | ||||
Ernst Savkovic (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-08-23 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mirko Votava (until 1982-06-30) | 1956-04-25 | ||||
Klaus Ackermann (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-03-20 | ||||
Egwin Wolf (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-01-28 | ||||
Helmut Nerlinger (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-02-27 | ||||
Gerd Kasperski (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-12-25 | ||||
Zoltan Varga (until 1976-06-30) | 1945-01-01 | ||||
Holger Kammann (until 1976-06-30) | |||||
Sturm | |||||
Peter Geyer (until 1981-08-31) | 1952-12-11 | ||||
Wolfgang Voge (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-09-15 | ||||
Burkhard Segler (until 1979-10-31) | 1951-03-05 | ||||
Hans-Werner Hartl (until 1977-09-30) | 1946-11-10 | ||||
Hans-Gerd Schildt (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-06-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1976-06-17 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1976-06-23 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |